Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 10:29:10 (UTC).

MIEKO SAITO VS. SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 MIEKO SAITO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7162

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAITO, MIEKO

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 110

SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEONE, LOUIS ANTHONY

Attorney at STUBBS & LEONE

2175 N. California Blvd,, Ste 900

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT DOES 1 TO 110 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-06-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-02-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-14-2015 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO SERVED AUG-10-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005185) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

notice of motion and motion for judgment on the pleadings

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT HEARING SET FOR OCT-26-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

Defendant san francisco commmunity college districts Memorandum of Poi

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Proof of Service re motion for judgment on the pleadings

PROOF OF SERVICE RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Request for Judicial Notice in support of motion for judgment on the p

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) DOES 1 TO 110

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100006898) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW TO ACCEPT AMENDMENT OF CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF MIEKO SAITO FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-06-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-06-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. ON OCTOBER 26, 2015, PLAINTIFF FILED A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; NOT REPORTED; DEPT. 302. =(302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-02-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302,THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS CONTINUED TO NOVEMBER 2, 2015, TO GIVE THE OPPOSING THE OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. THE OPPOSING PARTY MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302 WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE, NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 26, 2015, AT 4:00 PM. ANY EXHIBIT MUST BE SEPARATED BY AN EXHIBIT TAB PER CRC 3.1110(F). JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; NOT REPORTED. =302/EHG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-26-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MIEKO SAITO FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW TO ACCEPT AMENDMENT OF CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100006898) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100005880) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT HEARING SET FOR OCT-26-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005185) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO SERVED AUG-10-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAITO, MIEKO AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT DOES 1 TO 110 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-06-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-02-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-14-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEONE, LOUIS A.