This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/14/2018 at 07:16:26 (UTC).

MICHELLE M. CRITSER et al VS. HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 MICHELLE M CRITSER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CYNTHIA M. LEE, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, JOSEPH M. QUINN, MARLA J. MILLER, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, RICHARD B. ULMER, HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART and SUZANNE R. BOLANOS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8436

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

CYNTHIA M. LEE

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

JOSEPH M. QUINN

MARLA J. MILLER

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

RICHARD B. ULMER

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRITSER, DANNY

CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER,

GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP

GERACE, ROBERT JOHN

GERACE, SABRINA MARIE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BEST BUY CO., INC.

CHRYSLER CORPORATION

CHRYSLER GROUP LLC

DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG

DEXTER AXLE COMPANY

DEXTER DOOR

FORETRAVEL INC.

HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY

MODERN MOBILE HOME SVC

MODERN RV

SYSTEMAX INC.

TIGERDIRECT INC.

ELIXIR INDUSTRIES

SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD

SYNNEX CORPORATION

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RIGHTHAND, SCOTT DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT RIGHTHAND

275 Battery St Ste 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

SWANSON, MARK W

Attorney at L\/O MARK W. SWANSON

1001 G Street, Suite 201

Sacramento, CA 95814

STEFANKI, JOHN E

930 F Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

STEFANKI JOHN E

SWANSON MARK W

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HEALY, MICHAEL FITZGERALD

Attorney at SEDGWICK, LLP

333 Bush Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

CONANT, MATTHEW STANLEY

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., Suite 2600

Oakland, CA 946123541

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

Attorney at JACOBSEN & MCELROY

2401 American River Drive, Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

ROTH, DAVID V.

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

121 Spear St, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94105

CHILTON, STEPHANIE

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE LLP

1741 Technology Drive, Ste 200

San Jose, CA 95110

HARRIS, CHARLES L

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush St, Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

CUMMINGS, SASHA M.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St, Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BABBITS, DENNIS ALAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS P. ISAAC

Two Rincon Center, 121 Spear Street, Suite 410

San Francisco, CA 94105

KARREN, BRENT M

Attorney at MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DIESTEL, RICHARD STEPHEN

Attorney at BLEDSOE, DIESTEL, TREPPA & CRANE LLP

601 California St., 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941082805

Other Attorneys

MORONEY, BRETT T

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St. # 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD CRAWFORD MORENO & OSTERTAG LLP

1850 Mt. Diablo Blvd. Ste 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

EWING, MIKE

Attorney at EWING & ASSOCIATES

995 South Main St

Lakeport, CA 95453

HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

Attorney at LANKFORD CRAWFORD MORENO & OSTERTAG LLP

1850 Mt. Diablo Boulevard, Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUALLY DBA MODERN MOBILE HOME SVC AND MODERN RV JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BEST BUY CO., INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CHRYSLER GROUP LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15020143) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 15067035) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ORDER ON PLTFS' MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLTFS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15069160) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100014258) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Applicatio

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING MINORS COMPROMISE (TRANSACTION ID # 61415994) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY TIGERDIRECT INC. BEST BUY CO., INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE RE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KRYSOR INDUSTRIAL CO

PROOF OF SERVICE RE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KRYSOR INDUSTRIAL CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61223658) FILED BY DEFENDANT KYSOR INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION

Notice of Non-Opposition to Foretravel, Inc.s Motion for Determination

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FORETRAVEL, INC.S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60819417) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY TIGERDIRECT INC.

Declaration of Felicia Jaffereies in Support of Defendant Elixir Indus

DECLARATION OF FELICIA JAFFEREIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MICHELLE CRITSER FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 60800287) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIXIR INDUSTRIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FORETRAVEL, INC.S M

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FORETRAVEL, INC'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60735827) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORETRAVEL INC.

DECLARATION OF NICOLAS P. MARTIN, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPLO

DECLARATION OF NICOLAS P. MARTIN, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPLO TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. AND DEFENDANT SIMPLO TECHNOLOGY USA LOGISTIC COMPANY, LTD.S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60602110) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPLO TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD SIMPLO TECHNOLOGY USA LOGISTIC COMPANY, LTD

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-14-2016 CONTINUED TO OCT-19-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF SCOTT RIGHTHAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS LIMITED OPPOSI

DECLARATION OF SCOTT RIGHTHAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS LIMITED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT PACKARDS MOTION FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100002098) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE

Cross Defendants Hewlett Packard Company and Best Buy Co.s Answer to K

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59096019) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY BEST BUY CO., INC.

613 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4718126Z004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1718103S009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7817C01M013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5217B27M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4517B13M017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4517B13M016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717B08C017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717A23E008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : C0517A04M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5217A04M006

    Read MoreRead Less
931 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE SERVED MAR-19-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BEST BUY CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE SERVED MAR-19-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DEXTER AXLE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE SERVED MAR-19-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TIGERDIRECT INC. SYSTEMAX INC. (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MICHELLE M. CRITSER IS APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR DAVID W. CRITSER.) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • FEE PAID ON ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM APPLICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR (Fee:$20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CRITSER, MICHELLE M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVID W. CRITSER, A MINOR CRITSER, DANNY GERACE III, JAMES PHILIP GERACE, ROBERT JOHN GERACE, SABRINA MARIE AS TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY TIGERDIRECT INC. SYSTEMAX INC. BEST BUY CO., INC. FORETRAVEL INC. MODERN MOBILE HOME SVC MODERN RV CHRYSLER CORPORATION CHRYSLER GROUP LLC DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG DEXTER AXLE COMPANY DEXTER DOOR DOES 1 TO 10, INCL. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less