This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/04/2019 at 06:19:19 (UTC).

MICHELLE CHAVEZ VS. BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MICHELLE CHAVEZ against BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ET AL in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4314

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ, MICHELLE

Defendants

BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES

BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE

DOES 1 TO 10

ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAVEZ, MICHELLE AS TO DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

THE ARBITRATION ASSIGNMENT DATE OF SEP-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61791128) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62321650)

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62200072) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62136494) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAVEZ, MICHELLE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1350; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918316F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W1518214F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • THE ARBITRATION ASSIGNMENT DATE OF SEP-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62321650)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62200072) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62136494) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAVEZ, MICHELLE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61791128) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAVEZ, MICHELLE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAVEZ, MICHELLE AS TO DEFENDANT BAART BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES BAART COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE ADDICTION RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, INC. , DBA BAART ANTIOCH DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.