Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 23:25:06 (UTC).

MICHELE DEMARTINI VS. BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2011 MICHELE DEMARTINI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC , DBA MAIER SIEBEL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1755

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMARTINI, MICHELE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE AND EACH OF THEM

BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LITTON, THOMAS MARC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS MARC LITTON

555 Montgomery St, Ste 820

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

SIMPSON, PAUL VINCENT

Attorney at SIMPSON, GARRITY, INNES & JACUZZI

601 Gateway Blvd., Ste. 950

So San Francisco, CA 94080

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE AS TO DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE AND EACH OF THEM SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-18-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-15-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-03-2011 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-12-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE SERVED FEB-21-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-12-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER (Fee:410.00)

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-15-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAY-14-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-14-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-15-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 13.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2012
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-14-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/28/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 13.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-14-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-15-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-15-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAY-14-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-12-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-12-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE SERVED FEB-21-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-12-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-09-2012 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMARTINI, MICHELE AS TO DEFENDANT BABER INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., DBA MAIER SIEBEL BABER DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE AND EACH OF THEM SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-18-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-15-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-03-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less