This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 09:32:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL TILLMAN et al VS. INDRASIHN P. SOLANKI et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2009 MICHAEL TILLMAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against INDRASIHN P SOLANKI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0071

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED

BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

TILLMAN, MICHAEL

REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED

Defendants

SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL BUSINESS

Assignee

MENDEZ, DAVID G

San Leandro, CA 94577

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KODANI, TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES TIMOTHY J. KODANI

50 California St Ste 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

SMITH, GREGORY W.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY W SMITH

9100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 345E

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

GILG, WILLIAM EUGENE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. GILG

305 San Bruno Avenue West

San Bruno, CA 94066

Defendant Attorneys

WERTZ, ROBERT RANDY

Attorney at DRYDEN, MARGOLES, SCHIMANECK & WERTZ

555 Montgomery St. Ste. 750

San Francisco, CA 94111

HEATH, MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL HEATH

3251 Steiner Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G (Fee:IFP)

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT (HEARING DATE: 12/29/2011; OPPOS DUE 12/28/11; NO REPLY; NO TENTATIVE RULING)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DAVID MENDEZ MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF EXPARTE ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON MTN FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL BUSINESS DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-04-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-04-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-19-2009 (Fee:365.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN (Fee:740.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-25-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 303. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-12-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-04-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR MAY-26-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-26-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-23-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-23-2010 CONTINUED TO AUG-11-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-11-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-26-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-26-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION FOR CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION

Notice of Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-26-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 624 AT 1:30 PM. (206)

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-08-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-13-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2011
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-29-2011 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF EXPARTE ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON MTN FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, ASSIGNEE DAVID MENDEZ' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT. A R G U E D; MOVING PARTY PROVIDED THE MOVING PAPERS PRIOR TO THE HEARING. THE COURT RULED AS FOLLOWS: CONTINUED TO JANUARY 4, 2012 AT 9:30 A.M. TO ALLOW THE PARTIES TO SETTLE THE MATTER AMONG THEMSELVES. ATTY. KODANI APPEARED IN COURT FOR THE SECOND TIME AND INFORMED THE COURT THAT THE PARTIES HAVE SETTLED AND SHOULD TAKE THE JANUARY 4, 2012 HEARING OFF-CALENDAR. JUDGE: MARLA MILLER, REPORTER: LA VENA WARD, CSR # 7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. JODANI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DAVID MENDEZ MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION ANDM OTION FOR JUDGEMNT LIEN ENFORCEMENT (PER ADVANCING ORDER) FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G HEARING SET FOR DEC-29-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT (HEARING DATE: 12/29/2011; OPPOS DUE 12/28/11; NO REPLY; NO TENTATIVE RULING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT LIEN ENFORCEMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR PAYMENT AS CONDITION OF FULL & FINAL CASE SETTLEMENT (CCP 708.410 ET. SEQ) FILED BY ASSIGNEE MENDEZ, DAVID G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN (Fee:740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED SERVED AUG-12-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED SERVED AUG-13-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • COPYING FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED (Fee:.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE TO PLTF; BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED SERVED AUG-12-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE TO PLTF; BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED SERVED AUG-24-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED BARNES, JOHN H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TILLMAN, MICHAEL REGAN, JERILYN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SITUATED BROWN, LLOYD H. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT SOLANKI, INDRASIHN P. INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL WESTERN SOLANKI, SURANAB INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS HOTEL BUSINESS DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-04-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-04-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-19-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less