This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 10:58:32 (UTC).

MICHAEL T. VS. BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 MICHAEL T filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4054

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T., MICHAEL

Defendants

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS

DOES 1 TO 10

SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LILIENSTEIN, DAVID M

Defendant Attorneys

FELAHI, TINA SAFI

FULLER, CHAD R.

HAMILTON, OLIVER W.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH

SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN DOES 1 TO 10 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-22-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-21-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-29-2021

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) TO PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67773628)

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67696523) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRAIL DATE AND ASSOCIATED LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100162889) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APP TO CONT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100162889) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Associated Litigation

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ASSOCIATED LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100162889) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Declaration ISO App to Continue Trial Date and Associated Litigation a

DECLARATION ISO APP TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ASSOCIATED LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100161335) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Ex Parte App to Continue Trial Date and Associated Litigation and Disc

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER EX PARTE APP TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ASSOCIATED LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100161335) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF OLIVER W. HAMILTON FOR DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100158826) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TINA SAFI FELAHI FOR DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100158826) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Trial and Pretrial Dates

STIPULATION CONTINUING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES (TRANSACTION ID # 100158808) FILED BY BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-29-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-22-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Anthem Blue Cross Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67136284) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

Case Mnagement Conference Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67132409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar Sep-09-2022 Vacated; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketMASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-26-2022 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED 6/28/22. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar May-03-2022 Continued To Sep-26-22 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67773628)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67696523) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-29-2022 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT ON SEP-26-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 206 PER EX PARTE ORDER FILED ON 5/3/22. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRAIL DATE AND ASSOCIATED LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5022502M015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100162889) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APP TO CONT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100162889) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO NOV-01-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $1305; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H3321922F030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100142139) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN; Fee: $1305.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED SEP-17-2021, SERVED SEP-14-2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 100141993) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100140302), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL SERVED AUG-26-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE AUG-27-2021 AS TO DEFENDANT SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) TO PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5021820F012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100137165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF T., MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA HMO PLAN DOES 1 TO 10 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-22-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-21-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-29-2021; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less