This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 03:00:34 (UTC).

MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER VS. FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER filed an Other lawsuit against FARMATIC INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8115

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHUPPENHAUER, MICHAEL

Defendant

FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVELBISS, ROBERT OWEN

Attorney at JRA LAW PARTNERS, LLP

450 Pacific Avenue, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHUPPENHAUER, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-13-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-12-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-21-2017 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8115
Case Title:MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER VS. FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:JUL-17-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, JULY 17, 2017, LINE 9DEFENDANT FARMATIC INC.'s DEMURRER TO COMPLAINToff calendar. A first amended complaint was filed on June 29, 2017.


Case Number:*******8115
Case Title:MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER VS. FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:JAN-08-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Cross-Complaint
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, JANUARY 8, 2018, LINE 13, Motion 3PLAINTIFF MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER'S Motion To Dismiss Cross-ComplaintGRANTED. No opposition filed and good cause shown. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is confirmed, the court will sign the proposed order submitted with the moving papers. =302/HK


Case Number:*******8115
Case Title:MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER VS. FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:JAN-10-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 10, 2018, Line 9, CROSS-DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.Off calendar. The motion was advanced and heard on January 8, 2018 per the ex parte order filed December 26, 2017. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******8115
Case Title:MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER VS. FARMATIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:JAN-30-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel And For Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, January 30, 2018, Line 2, PLAINTIFF MICHAEL SCHUPPENHAUER's Motion To Compel And For Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Roger Mead, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Off calendar. Judgment entered on Jan. 18, 2018. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rmead@folgerlevin.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVELBISS, ROBERT OWEN