Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 15:22:17 (UTC).

MICHAEL SCHAUFLER VS. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 MICHAEL SCHAUFLER filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, ANDREW Y. S. CHENG, JOHN K. STEWART, GARRETT L. WONG and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2560

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

JOHN K. STEWART

GARRETT L. WONG

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, SCOTT A.

Attorney at BROWN\/POORE LLP

1350 Treat Blvd., Ste. 420

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

HOROWITZ, DANIEL AARON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL HOROWITZ

3650 Mt Diablo Blvd Suite 225

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant Attorney

HEINICKE, MALCOLM A

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

560 Mission Street, Twenty Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 64132885) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 64132885) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 64132885) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY HEARING SET FOR SEP-30-2019 AT 08:00 AM IN DEPT 606

DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND GENERAL DENIAL AND STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63156607) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-05-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-13-2019

MINUTES FOR JAN-24-2020 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR JAN-24-2020 9:30 AM

Defendants Requests for Judicial Notice

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100093794) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64600838) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4 TO CONFIRM THE NATURE AND EXTENT OF HIS RECOVERABLE DAMAGES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (TRANSACTION ID # 64600838) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1 TO EXCLUDE RECORDING AND TRANSCRIPT OF AUGUST 27 2014 CONFVERSATION IN ROBERT GOTELLIS OFFICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64600838) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

DECLARATION OF BRYAN H HECKENLIVELY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS I

DECLARATION OF BRYAN H HECKENLIVELY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NUMBER 2, NUMBER 3, NUMBER 4 AND NUMBER 5 (TRANSACTION ID # 64577629) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support of Their Subsequent Motion to S

REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR SUBSEQUENT MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF AFTER BRIEFING OF DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100090840) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion In Limine (No. 1) Regarding

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) REGARDING DAMAGES ARISING FROM TERMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100088804) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100085348) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OP

DECLARATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REDACTED ***REDACTED VERSION*** (TRANSACTION ID # 100084273) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL

Declaration of Scott A. Brown with Exhibits (A, B, C, H) Lodged Under

DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. BROWN WITH EXHIBITS (A, B, C, H) LODGED UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100083435) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL

Declaration of Scott A. Brown in Support of Plaintiffs Notice of Motio

DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. BROWN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 64132839) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialPayment : SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount : $455; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0820122J005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialPayment : SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount : $227.5; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0820116J008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialPayment : SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount : $845; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0420115J004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9219C19M019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5619A17M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6619A10M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B9519828M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419828M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519613M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8019603J002

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT OF THIS AND RELATED CASE UNDER CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.734; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANE P. SHIKMAN (TRANSACTION ID # 63327966) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JUN-27-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketOBJECTION HEARING OF JUN-05-2019 HELD. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 63318495) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100073415) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63292857) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, SHORT CAUSE TRIAL SET FOR OCT-07-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-05-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63156607) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63156607) FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINJUNCTIVE RELIEF, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHAUFLER, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-05-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-13-2019 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN A. SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Horowitz, Daniel Aaron