This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:46:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL RABENER VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2007 MICHAEL RABENER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4173

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

SB DECKING, INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CROSBY VALVE, INC.

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

CRANE CO.

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

DOES 1-8500

LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

KINIRY, JR, WILLIAM F.

Attorney at DLA PIPER RUDNICK

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St., Ste. 4900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

PARKER, JAMES CARL

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

FOGEL, STEFANIE J.

Attorney at DLA PIPER

33 Arch Street, 26Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110-1447

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

BERNARD, RANDALL K

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16839869) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19849600) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 27872707) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28866165) FILED BY DEFENDANT TYCO INTERNATIONAL (US) INC.

DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 33652278) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC." (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SHORTENED NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF FOR HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION MOTION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO SHORTENED-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF FOR HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.S SUMMARY JUDGMENT-ADJUDICATION MOTION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED TO SHORTENED NOTICE TO PLTF FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION MO (TRANSACTION ID # 33821589) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC."

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., erroneously sued herein as HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 35155586) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL RABENER, BETTY AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED RABENER, BETTY AS LEGAL HEIR OF MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35696792) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC."

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18886415) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 19849600) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

PLAINTIFFS? SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN(S) OF RECORDS AND PERSON(S) MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 23347602) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL RABENER, BETTY AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED RABENER, BETTY AS LEGAL HEIR OF MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23347602) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL RABENER, BETTY AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED RABENER, BETTY AS LEGAL HEIR OF MICHAEL RABENER, DECEASED

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 23706460) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24269401) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

JOINT STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENTS FOR ASBESTOS STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR

JOINT STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENTS FOR ASBESTOS STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR (TRANSACTION ID # 27103242) FILED BY OTHER DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 33652278) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC."

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF STEFANIE J. FOGEL TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

225 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44357043) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 27568 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1904263797, WARRANT #38201360, DATED JAN-30-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • DEC-14-2011 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY STEFANIE J. FOGEL - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL AS TO HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS FILED ON JUL-26-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • DEC-14-2011 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY WILLIAM F. KINIRY, JR - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL AS TO HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS FILED ON JUL-26-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011. DISMISSAL FILED 9/28/11. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40083623)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39396297) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 39092920) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-25-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38909985) AS TO DEFENDANT HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC."

    Read MoreRead Less
259 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14892243) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14874236) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER : STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICING AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S VIDEOTAPED TRIAL PRESERVATION TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICING AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S VIDEOTAPED TRIAL PRESERVATION TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 14703440) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 14703440) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICING AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S VIDEOTAPED TRIAL PRESERVATION TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 14703440) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RABENER, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSBY VALVE LLC (DOE 5) is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant