This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:38:40 (UTC).

MICHAEL LEYBOVICH VS. MEGABUS USA LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 MICHAEL LEYBOVICH filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEGABUS USA LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3062

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL

San Francisco, CA 94107

Defendant

MEGABUS USA LLC

349 1St Street

Elizabeth, NJ 07206

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,990.00 FILED BY LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT MEGABUS USA LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-20-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:IFP)

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. CASE SETTLED. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

RULING ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT MEGABUS USA LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. CASE SETTLED. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT MEGABUS USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL *AGENT FORN SERVICE* FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT MEGABUS USA LLC (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,990.00 FILED BY LEYBOVICH, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT MEGABUS USA LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-20-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less