This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:39:01 (UTC).

MICHAEL J. SHUSTER et al VS. MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 MICHAEL J SHUSTER filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL K WHITE CPA ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3067

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCCRACKEN, RICHARD L.

San Francisco, CA 94114

SHUSTER, MICHAEL J.

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendants

MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES

4111 - 18Th Street, Suite 8

San Francisco, CA 94114

GRAY CPA, MICHAEL

San Francisco, CA 94114

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED - JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL -

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE.APPEARANCES BY DEFENDANTS ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 60.00 - SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 30.00 - SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GRAY CPA, MICHAEL

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $6,500.00 FILED BY SHUSTER, MICHAEL J. MCCRACKEN, RICHARD L. AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES GRAY CPA, MICHAEL ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO MAY-01-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE.APPEARANCES BY DEFENDANTS ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO MAY-01-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED - JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT GRAY CPA, MICHAEL (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 30.00 - SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GRAY CPA, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 60.00 - SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $6,500.00 FILED BY SHUSTER, MICHAEL J. MCCRACKEN, RICHARD L. AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL K. WHITE CPA & ASSOCIATES GRAY CPA, MICHAEL ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less