This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 07:48:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL HAMER VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2010 MICHAEL HAMER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5630

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

PARK MECHANICAL, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM-INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION ("WESTINGHOUSE"), (SUED AS CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM, INC. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION))

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., SUCCESSOR TO AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

3M COMPANY

COLLINS ELECTRIC CO. OF SAN FRANCISCO

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

DOES 1-8500

ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CONWAY, PATRICIA KANTOR

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

MARTENS, DANIEL L.

Attorney at DAL SOGLIO & MARTENS LLP

222 North Sepulveda Blvd, Suite 2000

El Segundo, CA 90245

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAPCOE, LISA

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 625

Oakland, CA 94612

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery St., Ste 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

One California Street, Ste 1910

San Francisco, CA 94111

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3759

Other Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

Attorney at YARON & ASSOCIATES

601 California St. 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

TOBEY, ROBERT D.

Attorney at HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P.

71 Stevenson Street, 20Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105-2981

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DYNALECTRIC COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33020054) FILED BY DEFENDANT DYNALECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

Answer to Complaint-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33272167) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. (Fee:370.00)

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33587278) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CAUSE OF ACTION OF THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ARVINMERITOR INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41756691)PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY, AS TO DEFENDANT ARVINMERITOR, INC.

DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35512185) FILED BY DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. (Fee:410.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 2-3 & 1002-1003

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 2-3 & 1002-1003 (TRANSACTION ID # 36185433) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMER, MICHAEL (Fee:40.00)

Answer of Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33275487) FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 39411306) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMER, MICHAEL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 33770134) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 56956812): JOHNSON, DEREK S. SUBSTITUTED FOR POND, FRANK D AS ATTORNEY FOR CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM-INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION ("WESTINGHOUSE"), (SUED AS CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM, INC. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-19-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR #5915, FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43749717) FILED BY DEFENDANT RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43511329) FILED BY DEFENDANT F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43196498) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY, AS TO DEFT BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. SUCCESSOR TO AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 42506342)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42430623)THIRD CASEU OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY AS TO DEFT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42394713)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENATION) ONLY, AS TO DEFT. ARVINMERITOR, INC.(TRANSACTION ID # 42077953)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY, AS TO DEFT D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 41888887)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33072441) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTERN PLUMBING & HEATING CO., INC. (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33046772) FILED BY DEFENDANT ARVINMERITOR, INC. (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33020054) FILED BY DEFENDANT DYNALECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32995156) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32989726) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32819462) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 32781082) FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMER, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMER, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC. 3M COMPANY ABHI-CROCKETT, INC. AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. ANGELO J. DANERI, INC. ARVINMERITOR, INC. ATLAS MECHANICAL, INC. BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC. CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. COLLINS ELECTRIC CO. OF SAN FRANCISCO CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. CUPERTINO ELECTRIC, INC. D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC. DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. DOES 1-8500 DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. DYNALECTRIC COMPANY EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY GEORGE F. SCHULER, INC. GRINNELL CORPORATION HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. J.T. THORPE, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. MACARTHUR COMPANY MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PARK MECHANICAL, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PERINI CORPORATION PERINI LAND AND DEVELOPMENT COMPANY ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY RODONI-BECKER CO., INC. RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SHELL OIL COMPANY SWINERTON BUILDERS THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY WESTERN PLUMBING & HEATING CO., INC. WILLIAMS & BURROWS, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-18-2011 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINE ENGINEERING & SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where F.P. LATHROP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION is a litigant