This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:10:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL HALSETH VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2007 MICHAEL HALSETH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4087

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALSETH, MICHAEL

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

CSK AUTO, INC.

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND CO.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

 

Court Documents

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14640564) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Thorpe Insulation Companys Answer To Complaint For Personal

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14786893) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Allis-Chalmers Corp. Product Liability Trust to Complaint fo

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14789186) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.S DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR CO

DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14873712) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.?S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MO TO COMPEL DEFT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC'S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 20292056) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALSETH, MICHAEL

EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH SEARS BARANDA IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH SEARS BARANDA IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20442496) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE AND SERVEV REGARDING REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE AND SERVEV REGARDING REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 20516100) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF POWER BOILER SALES, INC. ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21029109) AS TO DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLTF'S MTN TO COMPEL DEFT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 21489638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALSETH, MICHAEL

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14883329) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

CSKs Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 15651085): KANNETT, MARK SIMON SUBSTITUTED FOR GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL AS ATTORNEY FOR CSK AUTO, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to CSK AUTO, INC. only.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18576778) AS TO DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20348892) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

EXHIBIT F TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH SEARS BARANDA IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT F TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH SEARS BARANDA IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20442496) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED, WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 21556184) AS TO DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21570994) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF DR. DONALD BREYER MIL#8

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF DR. DONALD BREYER MIL#8 (TRANSACTION ID # 33311781) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only, with a mutual waiver of costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33798174) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2011
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 22025 FOR TRANSACTION R1608A15J030 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903684097, WARRANT #38200779, DATED MAY-23-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36543880)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36393250) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36346135) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-17-2010 TO JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34285885) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33798174) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS OF SEP-13-2010 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON DEC-17-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14640564) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14626902) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14626902) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14621841) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 14621841) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14621841) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14621841) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALSETH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALSETH, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THOMAS DEE ENGINERRING COMPANY is a litigant