This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 21:10:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL BELDING VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2013 MICHAEL BELDING filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6183

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELDING, MICHAEL

Defendants

SUN SHIP, LLC

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIOANL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE

ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA

FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CHICAGO PUMP BUSINESS

WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US INC.

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

MACARTHUR COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

KELLEY, RENEE C.

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, Thirty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JOHNSON, DEREK S.

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Ste 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

GREENE, RAYMOND ALBERT

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119, 1901 Harrison St., 11Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94604

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero Center #2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE, & BLUM LLP

500 Washington St., Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

500 Washington Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON JENKINS RENSTROM LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery St., Ninth Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

 

Court Documents

FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIO

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57564465) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57529973) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

DECLARATION OF JAMIE A. NEWBOLD SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DE

DECLARATION OF JAMIE A. NEWBOLD SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57529973) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFEN

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57529973) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONa??S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57210693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

INDEX OF EXHIBITS C-E TO THE DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONa??S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

INDEX OF EXHIBITS C-E TO THE DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57210693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

INDEX OF EXHIBITS A-B TO THE DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONa??S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

INDEX OF EXHIBITS A-B TO THE DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57210693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONa??S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF NICOLE BROWN YUEN IN SUPPORT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57210693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONa??S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57210693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT & PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CLUTCH & BRAKE XCHANGE, INC. CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. CUMMINS INC. FLOWSERVE US INC. FMC CORPORATION HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. MACARTHUR COMPANY METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION SUN SHIP, LLC THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC. (Fee:1450.00)

DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC.S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.

DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER

DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.

Proof of Service for CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)

Proof of Service for Sun Ship, LLC

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-10-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC

Proof of Service for Parker-Hannifin Corporation

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Proof of Service for Owens-Illinois, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58526956) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (503) HEARING SET FOR JUN-02-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58429850) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58190557) AS TO DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 58095313)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-21-2015 - CASE SETTLED. JUDGE HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: YOLANDA MAZARIEGOS, PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (613)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-19-2015 CONTINUED TO OCT-21-2015 AT 2:00 PM IN 613, FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE. JASON ROSE, ESQ., OF BRAYTON AND PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFFS. MISHAN WROE, ESQ., APPEARING FOR DEFENANT OWENS- ILLINOIS, INC./ONLY DEFENDANT LEFT. HON. HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: YOLANDA MAZARIEGOS, PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: TARA L. WILLLIAMS, CSR#13428, TELEPHONE # 877-451 1580. (613)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CORRESPONDENCE BETWEEN HAROLD BOESCHENSTEIN AND EDWARD AMES (TRANSACTION ID # 58018594) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ARTICLES AND ADVERTISEMENTS NOT SEEN OR RELIED UPON BY THE PLAINTIFF (TRANSACTION ID # 58018594) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE SO-CALLED AMES DOCUMENTS FROM ADMISSION INTO EVIDENCE AGAINST DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 58018594) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-10-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54273930), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL SERVED SEP-09-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54164108) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT & PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELDING, MICHAEL AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CLUTCH & BRAKE XCHANGE, INC. CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. CUMMINS INC. FLOWSERVE US INC. FMC CORPORATION HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. MACARTHUR COMPANY METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION SUN SHIP, LLC THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6183
Case Title:MICHAEL BELDING VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Court Date:JUL-23-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, July 23, 2015 in Department 503, Line 3. Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendant sustained its initial burden. Plaintiff failed to present admissible evidence to create a triable issue whether he was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant. Even if plaintiff's declaration is admissible in its entirety, plaintiff failed to present admissible evidence to create a triable issue whether the Durametallic packing to which he was exposed contained asbestos. Defendant's objections to the declarations of plaintiff and Charles Ay are sustained. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 10:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western MacArthur Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MACARTHUR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN SHIP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant