This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 19:59:54 (UTC).

MESHA MONGE-IRIZARRY VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2012 MESHA MONGE-IRIZARRY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1821

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE

BANK OF AMERICA

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

RECONTRUST COMPANY, N A

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

DOES 1-X

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPALAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

SIMPICH WILLIAM M

SIMPICH, WILLIAM MORRIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM M. SIMPICH

1736 Franklin St., 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 946123423

Defendant Attorney

KENNEY, MARK JOSEPH

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA AS TO DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON BANK OF AMERICA RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPALAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-21-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-06-2012 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT {JOINTLY} FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER ( HEARING JULY 16, 2013; OPPOSITION IS DUE ON JULY 8, 2013; REPLY FILED AND SERVED NO LATER THAN JULY 12, 2013)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-16-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE ORDER RE DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JUDGMENT THEREON. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2 SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-16-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST FOR CLERKS/REPORTER TRANSCRIPT

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (8.124)(PROCEED WITHOUT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT)

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2 HEARING SET FOR SEP-18-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA AS TO DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON BANK OF AMERICA RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPALAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIDAL NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA

REPLY

REPLY TO OPPOS TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-21-2012 CONTINUED TO JAN-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-24-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-05-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA, THE BANK OF NEW YORK, BANK OF AMERICA, RECONSTRUCT COMPANY, N.A.'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A139993 DIV 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, NO RT (APPEAL FILED 10/7/13, A139993 DIV 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (8.124)(PROCEED WITHOUT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED BY APPELLANT MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-16-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED SUSTAINING DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2 SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DEMURRER OF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON HEARING SET FOR SEP-18-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA SERVED JUL-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2 (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS, CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-BC2 SERIES 2007-BC2 HEARING SET FOR SEP-18-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONGE-IRIZARRY, MESHA AS TO DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON BANK OF AMERICA RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPALAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-21-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-06-2012 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less