This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 15:58:54 (UTC).

MELANIE HARRIS VS. JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2013 MELANIE HARRIS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JELANI, INC , A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2299

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS, MELANIE

Defendants

JELANI II, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

JOHNSON, ROTH

JELANI II, INC.

JELANI INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEDER, DANIEL LOUIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL FEDER

332 Pine St. Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

CATLOS, KATHERINE S

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH VOLUCK GONZO LLP

425 California St Ste 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE AS TO DEFENDANT JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA JELANI II, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA JOHNSON, ROTH DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-20-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-20-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-05-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE SERVED JUN-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE SERVED JUN-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JELANI II, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC. JELANI II, INC. (Fee:900.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON, ROTH (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON, ROTH JELANI II, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-14-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-20-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC. JELANI II, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2014
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-14-2014 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 12/5/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC. JELANI II, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF MELANIE HARRIS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED AS TO THESE PARTICULAR SUBPOENAS AND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL INFORMATION. THE SUBPOENAS DIRECTED TO HER FORMER EMPLOYERS ARE TOO BROADLY WORDED. BALANCING THE PRIVACY RIGHTS OF THE PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS' RIGHT TO PREPARE AN APPROPRIATE DEFENSE, THE SCOPE OF THE SUBPOENAS AND MEDICAL REQUESTS ARE WELL BEYOND THE DISCOVERY NECESSARY IN THIS CASE WHERE THE CLAIM IS SEXUAL HARASSMENT AS OPPOSED TO WRONGFUL TERMINATION BASED ON ALLEGED NON-PERFORMANCE. SIMILARLY, WHERE THE MEDICAL DAMAGE CLAIM ALLEGES MENTAL DISTRISS, THERE IS NO JUSTIFICATION FOR INQUIRY INTO HER ENTIRE MEDICAL HISTORY. IN BOTH INSTANCES, MORE NARROWLY DRAWN DISCOVERY REQUESTS WOULD BE APPROPRIATE. (PREVAILING PARTY TO SUBMIT A FORM OF ORDER.) JUDGE PRO TEM: PAUL RENNE; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; NOT REPORTED. (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-19-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION FORPROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DECLARATION OF GABRIEL N. RUBIN FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-14-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-20-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER;, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE HEARING SET FOR NOV-19-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON, ROTH (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JELANI INC. JELANI II, INC. (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE SERVED JUN-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JELANI II, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE SERVED JUN-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, MELANIE AS TO DEFENDANT JELANI, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA JELANI II, INC., A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA JOHNSON, ROTH DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-20-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-20-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-05-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less