This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:37:41 (UTC).

MEINA LIU VS. TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 MEINA LIU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3531

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIU, MEINA

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.

TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.

SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL, G SETH

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT WARMUTH, APC

17700 Castleton St Ste 168

City Of Industry, CA 91748

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOT, EUGENE BURTON

Attorney at BERTRAND, FOX, ELLIOT, OSMAN & WENZEL

2749 Hyde Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA AS TO DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-06-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-06-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-14-2018

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033879) FILED BY DEFENDANT SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH

DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033879) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037263) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Plaintiff Meina Lius Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037641) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR AUG-06-2018. THE JUN-06-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.; AND SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S

DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.; AND SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO THE COURTS ORDER TO ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038992) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH

Plaintiff Meina Lius Joinder to Objections of Defendants Travelodge Ho

PLAINTIFF MEINA LIUS JOINDER TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. AND SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO THE COURTS ORDER TO ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100039011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-17-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE IS REMOVED FROM ARBITRATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R3418517J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918514J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918329F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918329F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1018105F013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-17-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE IS REMOVED FROM ARBITRATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • OBJECTION HEARING OF JUN-06-2018 HELD. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: GGONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUN-06-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF MEINA LIUS JOINDER TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. AND SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO THE COURTS ORDER TO ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100039011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.; AND SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO THE COURTS ORDER TO ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038992) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR AUG-06-2018. THE JUN-06-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100037641) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037641) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100037263) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037263) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033879) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033879) FILED BY DEFENDANT SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. - DBA TRAVELODGE SF AIRPORT NORTH (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, MEINA AS TO DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-06-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-06-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-14-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3531
Case Title:MEINA LIU VS. TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-26-2019 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Attend Deposition And Medical Examination In San Francisco Or San Mateo County
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, March 26 2019, Line 2,DEFENDANT TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC., SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.'s Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Attend Deposition And Medical Examination In San Francisco Or San Mateo County.Off calendar per request of the moving party (email 3/21/19).=(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******3531
Case Title:MEINA LIU VS. TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:DEC-19-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, December 19, 2019, Line 5, DEFENDANTS TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC., SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary AdjudicationOff calendar. Request for dismissal of Defendant Travelodge Hotels, Inc. filed 12/5/19 and motion withdrawn 12/11/19. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SFO AIRPORT HOSPITALITY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELODGE HOTELS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL GREGORY SETH ESQ