This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:58 (UTC).

MAYA FUTAMURA VS. BRANDI M. PRESLEY et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 MAYA FUTAMURA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRANDI M PRESLEY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8429

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FUTAMURA, MAYA

ROES 1-50

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, ROGER STONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROGER S REYNOLDS

595 Market St Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LANE, DAVID P.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY V. DEBERNARD

1255 Treat Blvd, Suite 240

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FUTAMURA, MAYA ROES 1-50

DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NEAL RICHARD WINCHELL.

DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NEAL RICHARD WINCHELL.

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR DENNIS CLARK BIRKHIMER.

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR DENNIS CLARK BIRKHIMER.

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUTAMURA, MAYA AS TO DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator (CRC 3.815)

ARBITRATOR ARNOLD I. WEBER APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION OCT-04-2013 THROUGH JAN-02-2014.

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Random Selection From Panel of Arbitrators

PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE OCT-03-2013.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 6.0 DAYS

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-09-2013. JUL-03-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF LANE, DAVID P. ON AUG-02-2013 THROUGH AUG-30-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2014
  • ASSIGNMENT TO ARBITRATION OF OCT-04-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ARBITRATOR ARNOLD I. WEBER APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION OCT-04-2013 THROUGH JAN-02-2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR DENNIS CLARK BIRKHIMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NEAL RICHARD WINCHELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE OCT-03-2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF LANE, DAVID P. ON AUG-02-2013 THROUGH AUG-30-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 6.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-09-2013. JUL-03-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FUTAMURA, MAYA ROES 1-50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUTAMURA, MAYA AS TO DEFENDANT PRESLEY, BRANDI M. AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less