This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/12/2019 at 13:19:17 (UTC).

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, NEWTON LAM, CHARLES F. HAINES, HAROLD E. KAHN and RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5874

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

NEWTON LAM

CHARLES F. HAINES

HAROLD E. KAHN

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

ESTHER EAMES, LLC

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

DOES FIFTY-ONE THROUGH DOE ONE HUNDRED, INCLUSIVE

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Intervenors

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMEO, MARK JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. ROMEO

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GRAVES, BENJAMIN C

1100 Sir Francis Drake Blvd., Suite 1

Kentfield, CA 94904

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

ZUMSTEIN, MATTHEW D

Attorney at SMITH CURRIE & HANCOCK LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

SMITH, STANLEY WAYNE

Attorney at NIVEN & SMITH, LLP

505 Sansome Street, Suite 450

San Francisco, CA 94111-3179

ROMEO, MARK JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. ROMEO

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GRAVES, BENJAMIN C

1100 Sir Francis Drake Blvd., Suite 1

Kentfield, CA 94904

Intervenor Attorney

WOLF, MARC PRICE

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYS

1390 Market Street Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING ESTHER EAMES' AMENDED MOTION FO SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PARTITION AS MATTER OF RIGHT (ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED IN SASE)

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. ZUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF ESTHER EAMES, LLCS RE

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. ZUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF ESTHER EAMES, LLCS REPLY RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100040606) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

ESTHER EAMES, LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTOR

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PARTITION AS A MATTER OF RIGHT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040606) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMA

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY OF ADJUDICATION OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PARTITION AS A MATTER OF RIGHT (TRANSACTION ID # 62794870) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLCS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTE

AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100051075) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC HEARING SET FOR JAN-10-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMAR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGEMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PARTITION AS A MATTER OF RIGHT (TRANSACTION ID # 62538630) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGM

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PARTITION AS A MATTER OF RIGHT (TRANSACTION ID # 100049135) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC HEARING SET FOR OCT-30-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS SUPPORTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS SUPPORTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100049135) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO 05.18.20

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100049342) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO MAY 18, 2020 (COPY IN DEPT. 206 OUTBOX)

Amended Declaration of Matthew Zumstein In Support of Ex Parte

AMENDED DECLARATION OF MATTHEW ZUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE (TRANSACTION ID # 100049207) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE RE ESTHER EAMES EX PARTE APPLICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100049132) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100049132) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100049132) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D ZUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION F

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D ZUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE TO MAY 18 2020 (TRANSACTION ID # 100049132) FILED BY DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC

NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION IN REGARDS TO A STIPULATIO

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPLICATION IN REGARDS TO A STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 100049132) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF ESTHER EAMES STI

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER (STIPULATION) TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100048995) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

ESTHER EAMES, LLCS AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS IN INTERVENTION CITY A

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100069434) FILED BY DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION ESTHER EAMES, LLC

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619807M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619805M015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5219219M024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5219219M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : B5219130M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5219129F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1718B01M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : W6618A19M010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1418928M019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6618622F004

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER (TRANSACTION ID # 62048389) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62047887), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC SERVED APR-23-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; AND ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61966740) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PROPOSED RECEIVER JEFF APPENRODT (TRANSACTION ID # 61966740) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MOHAMMED REZAIAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; AND ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61966740) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; AND ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61966740) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; AND ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61966740) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61954898) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-19-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-27-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:JUN-22-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Amended Notice Of Hearing On Application For Appointment Of Receiver; And Issuance Of Preliminary Injunction
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, June 22, 2018, Line 6. PLAINTIFF MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC'S Amended Notice Of Hearing On Application For Appointment Of Receiver; And Issuance Of Preliminary Injunction. GRANTED. No opposition filed. Receiver to file $10,000 bond. =(501/GLW)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:NOV-30-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION / Notice Of Motion & Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday November 30, 2018 line 3.DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC MOTION / Notice Of Motion & Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctionstransferred to Department 302 to be heard on Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 9:00am.= (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:DEC-05-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Esther Eames, Llc Motion / Notice Of Motion & Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, December 5, 2018, Line 4, Defendant Esther Eames, LLC's Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Jason Yurasek, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: All parties to appear and be prepared to discuss: a) whether the movant satisfied the requirement to meet and confer prior to filing the motion to compel and motion for sanctions, b) whether respondent indicated at any time it would be submitting written responses to document requests signed on 11/8/2018 and purportedly served on 11/16/2018, c) proof of service of said written responses, d) any meet and confer that occurred between counsel regarding same, e) whether any documents in response to the document requests at issue have actually been produced to the requesting party. The parties shall come to Court with proposed orders for submission and consideration.=(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-02-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Esther Eames, Llc Motion / Notice Of Motion & Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 2, 2019, Line 3, Defendant Esther Eames, LLC.'S Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary SanctionsContinued to Jan. 9, 2019 per the Court. =(302/NL)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-09-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Esther Eames, Llc'S Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 9, 2019, Line 12, Defendant Esther Eames, LLC'S Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) And For Monetary SanctionsHearing required unless the parties agree to an order adopting the recommendation of Judge Pro Tem Jason Yurasek. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-10-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday January 10, 2019 line 6.DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTcontinued to January 22, 2019. Moving party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.7B and provide a courtesy copies of all moving and reply papers to Department 501 no later than January 15, 2019, with a cover letter reflecting the new hearing date. Opposing party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.7B and provide a courtesy copies of all opposition papers to Department 501 no later than January 15, 2019, with a cover letter reflecting the new hearing date.= (501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-22-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday January 22, 2019 line 2.DEFENDANT ESTHER EAMES, LLC AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTDENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant's Exhibits B and C are the answer and complaint from an unrelated case. Said exhibits are the same in both the filed motion and the courtesy copies provided to the Court. On the basis of the provided exhibits, the Court finds that Defendant did not shift its burden with respect to triable issues of material fact. = (501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:FEB-21-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs In Interventions Notice Of Motion And Motion To Intervene In Action
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for February 20, 2019 line 5.INTERVENOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA Plaintiffs In Interventions' Motion To Intervene In ActionOFF CALENDAR, re-noticed for January 26, 2019. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******5874
Case Title:MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ESTHER EAMES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL
Court Date:FEB-26-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Re-Notice Of Motion And Motion To Intervene In Action
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday February 26, 2019 line 2.INTERVENOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA Re-Notice Of Motion And Motion To Intervene In ActionOFF CALENDAR, heard and granted on February 19, 2019. =(501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESTHER EAMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MAXIMO INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant