This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/11/2023 at 01:01:39 (UTC).

MAUREEN FERREL VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 MAUREEN FERREL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9715

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERREL, MAUREEN

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLAN, CHRISTOPHER B.

Defendant Attorney

SIMS, III, HUNTER W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 10 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-19-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-18-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-26-2022

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) TO PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67911536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN SERVED AUG-04-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendant City and County of San Francisco Answer to Plaintiff Unverif

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendant City and County of San Francisco Demand for Trial by Jury

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendant City and County of San Francisco Objection to Judge Pro Temp

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68148215) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100178119) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-11-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-19-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Defendant City and County of San Francisco Notice of Objection and Obj

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 68253491) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR OCT-19-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/22/2024

HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2023

HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Oct-19-2022 Set For Trial On Jan-22-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketOBJECTION HEARING HELD ON OCT-19-2022. JUDGE SAMUEL K. FENG; CLERK V.WU - NOT REPORTED (610)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

HearingMatter(s): OBJECTION HEARING CALENDAR Off Calendar Oct-19-2022 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Oct-06-2022 Set For Trial On Dec-11-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 68253491) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR OCT-19-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-11-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-19-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100178119) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68148215) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
09/06/2022

DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 68042479) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN; Fee: $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68040979) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: EXEMPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67911536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN SERVED AUG-04-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) TO PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122520F001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67640199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERREL, MAUREEN AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 10 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-19-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-18-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-26-2022; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less