This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2023 at 01:40:08 (UTC).

MATTIE J. BESS VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 MATTIE J BESS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2882

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BESS, MATTIE J.

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 50

SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL RAILWAY

SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, JOHN HUGHES

Defendant Attorney

LI, LUCIA Q.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL RAILWAY DOES 1 TO 50 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-12-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-09-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-20-2023

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) TO PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL RAILWAY

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COM

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO? S OBJECTION TO COURT COMMI

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.3(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERV

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69588532) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210031588) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-04-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-12-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Mar-30-2023 Set For Trial On Dec-04-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-04-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-12-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210031588) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69588532) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type: EXEMPT; Receipt Number: W1523223F008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1523223J009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69188566) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: EXEMPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL RAILWAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210025503), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. SERVED JAN-06-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE JAN-06-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) TO PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R4122B22F026

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BESS, MATTIE J. AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL RAILWAY DOES 1 TO 50 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-12-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-09-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-20-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less