This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 23:44:54 (UTC).

MATTHEW J DROESSLER VS. JAMES A MOORE et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2012 MATTHEW J DROESSLER filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES A MOORE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2687

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

J MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL

J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOODMAN WILLIAM M

GOODMAN, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-26-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-26-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-24-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-11-2012 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-26-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DROESSLER, MATTHEW J AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE, JAMES A AN INDIVIDUAL J. MOORE PARTNERS LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-26-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-24-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-11-2012 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less