This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 13:39:17 (UTC).

MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS VS. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2009 MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9769

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

Defendant and Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Respondents

MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD

CALIFORNIA MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

ALLENBY, CLIFF

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

QUACINELLA, LUCY

Attorney at MULTIFORUM ADVOCACY SOLUTIONS

275 Fifth St, Ste 416

San Francisco, CA 94103

MURPHY, CATHERINE S

Attorney at WESTERN CENTER ON LAW & POVERTY INC

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

KEYS, MICHAEL DAVID

Attorney at BAY AREA LEGAL AID

1035 Market Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

ZWIBELMAN, MICHAEL A.

Attorney at DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

455 Golden Gate Ave. Ste 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

BUNSHOFT, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

455 Golden Gate Avenue,, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-3664

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD ALLENBY, CLIFF CHAIR OF THE MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS.

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTOIN TO ENFORCE THE JUDGMENT AND WRIT, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS HEARING SET FOR DEC-01-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

ORDER

ORDER ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT AND WRIT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PER STIPULATION TO CONITNUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT AND WRIT FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES CALIFORNIA MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID ALLENBY, CLIFF (Fee:EXEMPT)

ORDER

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT AND WRIT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID DIRECTOR OF DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES CALIFORNIA MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD ALLENBY, CLIFF (Fee:EXEMPT)

ORDER

ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FEE MOTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES (Fee:EXEMPT)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER BUNSHOFT FILED BY RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO AMENDED RETURN FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

ORDER

ORDER ENFORCING WRIT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO HAVE PROJUECT MANAGER ATTEND SEPT 27 STATUS HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS (Fee:60.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONT BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES (Fee:EXEMPT)

ORDER

ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE & HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (HRG - 12/14/12; OPPOS - 11/21; REPLY - 12/07)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

COMMENTS FOR 11-13-12 STATUS HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON DEEMED ELIGIBLE INFANTS FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS (Fee:60.00)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISSOLVING WRIT OF MANDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION REGARDING DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF MANDATE (APPEARING EX PARTE) FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON DEEMED ELIGIBLE INFANTS IS OFF-CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: LESLIE C. NICHOLS, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185 =(302/LCN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-24-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON DEEMED ELIGIBLE INFANTS HEARING SET FOR SEP-24-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TARA NAISBITT IN RESPONSE TOI PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REVISE CALHEERS APPLICATION FILED BY RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES CALIFORNIA MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (EX PARTE) SHORTENING TIME RE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON DEEMED ELIGIBLE INFANTS; HRG 9/24/13; OPPO DUE 9/18/13 BY NOON; ALL REPLY PAPERS DUE 9/20/13 BY NOON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON DEEMED ELIGIBLE INFANTS FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS' AMENDED MOTION TO ENFORCE THE JUDGMENT AND WRIT IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2010
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. BLACK, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NEAL KAUFMAN, MD., M.P.H. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DECLARATION OF CATHERINE S. MURPHY AUTHENTICATING DEPOSITION OF VIVIA AUBLE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DECLARATION OF TOM CONROW IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE' APPENDIX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES, NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS HEARING SET FOR MAR-02-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • POS OF PETITONER'S FIRST SET OPF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES CALIFORNIA MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID ALLENBY, CLIFF (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETN FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS SERVED AUG-27-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID DIRECTOR OF DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETN FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS SERVED AUG-27-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT ALLENBY, CLIFF CHAIR OF THE MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS AS TO RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD MAXWELL-JOLLY, DAVID DIRECTOR OF DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY ALLENBY, CLIFF CHAIR OF THE MANAGED RISK MEDICAL INSURANCE BOARD IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maternal and Child Health Access is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Health Care Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Keys