Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:37:39 (UTC).

MARY OCHOA VS. COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 MARY OCHOA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COVINGTON BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, TERI L. JACKSON, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3959

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA, MARY

Vallejo, CA 94591

Defendants

HESTER, TIMOTHY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHAIR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, CHAIR OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTE,

COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL PARTNERSHIP

WATERS, JOHN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF ADMINISTRATION OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

FRANKEL, SIMON IN HIS OFFICAL CAPACITY AS MC LIAISON FOR THE SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

WIGTON, ANNETTE

COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

WATERS, JOHN

HESTER, TIMOTHY

WIGTON, ANNETTE IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

BURKE, LINDSAY IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS DEPUTY COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

WALLS, NISA IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HUMAN RESOURCES DIRECTOR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

HESTER, TIMOTHY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHAIR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, CHAIR OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, MC LIAISON TO COVINGTON AND BURLING'S GENERAL COUNSEL AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

FRANKEL, SIMON

WALLS, NISA

BURKE, LINDSAY

HUVELLE, JEFFREY

HUVELLE, JEFFREY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON, TRACY

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-29-2017 HELD AND SETTLED. CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-31-2017 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (22.0)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FEDEX

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FEDEX (TRANSACTION ID # 60671575) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY

DECLARATION OF TRACY THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF

DECLARATION OF TRACY THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER UNDER SEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 60598399) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS ON RESPONSE TO OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-25-2017 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE MAR-15-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DEFENDANT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60082555) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-01-2017 CONTINUED TO MAR-15-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED - PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 60023224) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP HESTER, TIMOTHY HUVELLE, JEFFREY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 60023224) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP HESTER, TIMOTHY WATERS, JOHN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY HAND DELIVERY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY HAND DELIVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 59945829) FILED BY DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP HESTER, TIMOTHY WATERS, JOHN HUVELLE, JEFFREY BURKE, LINDSAY WIGTON, ANNETTE WALLS, NISA FRANKEL, SIMON

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

AMENDED MTN TO COMPEL DISCO FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY HEARING SET FOR JAN-30-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT FRANKEL, SIMON IN HIS OFFICAL CAPACITY AS MC LIAISON FOR THE SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT WATERS, JOHN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF ADMINISTRATION OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-09-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL PARTNERSHIP

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY AS TO DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL PARTNERSHIP SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-01-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-31-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-09-2017 (Fee:450.00)

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W1617524J005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : R4517522M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R4717517M014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R5417515R005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R5417515M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417515R008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417515M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W2017113M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W2216C16M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5216C13R006

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT FRANKEL, SIMON IN HIS OFFICAL CAPACITY AS MC LIAISON FOR THE SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT WALLS, NISA IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HUMAN RESOURCES DIRECTOR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT WIGTON, ANNETTE IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT BURKE, LINDSAY IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS DEPUTY COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT HUVELLE, JEFFREY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT WATERS, JOHN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF ADMINISTRATION OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-08-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT HESTER, TIMOTHY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHAIR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, CHAIR OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, MC LIAISON TO COVINGTON AND BURLING'S GENERAL COUNSEL AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY SERVED SEP-09-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OCHOA, MARY AS TO DEFENDANT COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, A MULTINATIONAL PARTNERSHIP HESTER, TIMOTHY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHAIR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, CHAIR OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, MC LIAISON TO COVINGTON AND BURLING'S GENERAL COUNSEL AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY WATERS, JOHN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF ADMINISTRATION OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY HUVELLE, JEFFREY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BURKE, LINDSAY IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS DEPUTY COUNSEL FOR EMPLOYMENT OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY WIGTON, ANNETTE IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY WALLS, NISA IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HUMAN RESOURCES DIRECTOR OF COVINGTON & BURLING LLP AND IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY FRANKEL, SIMON IN HIS OFFICAL CAPACITY AS MC LIAISON FOR THE SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP AND IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-01-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-31-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-09-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less