This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:47:23 (UTC).

MARTIN ONTIVEROS LUJAN VS. AMCORD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2007 MARTIN ONTIVEROS LUJAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4075

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS

Defendants

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY AND D/B/A O-I)

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

AMCORD, INC. , (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT)

GRINNELL LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

GRINNELL CORP.

CRANE CO.

T.H. AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND F/K/A T.H. AGRICULTURES & NUTRITION COMPANY, INC., F/K/A THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL CO., INC.)

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., (INDIVIDUALLY AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY, F/K/A WESTERN FIBERGLAS COMPANY)

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC (AKA AND SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON WORKS AND DBA KEYSTONE BRANDED PRODUCTS)

RICH-TEX, INC.

JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINING, CAROLIN K.

Attorney at BARON & BUDD, P.C.

9465 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 460

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHARP, GARY D

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MARGOLES, LAWRENCE A

Attorney at DRYDEN, MARGOLES, SCHIMANECK & WERTZ

101 California St, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

BERKES, ROBERT H

Attorney at BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ADAMS, BARBARA ROSE

Attorney at ADAMS NYE SINUNU BRUNI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny St., 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 14605497): BLACKARD EUGENE C SUBSTITUTED FOR SHARP, GARY D AS ATTORNEY FOR HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16158270) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 16348015) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF KEN COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO UNION CARBIDE?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Filed concurrently with Plaintiffs? Opposition to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation?s Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs? Opposition to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation?s Separate

DECLARATION OF KEN COHEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO UNION CARBIDE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH OPPOSITION TO DEFT UNION CARBIDE CORP.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OPPOSITION TO UNION CARBIDE'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION] (TRANSACTION ID # 16398979) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT AND TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS? EXPERTS THAT TRIVIAL OR REMOTE ASBESTOS EXPOSURES OR EXPOSURES NOT CONSTITUTING A SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR CONTRIBUTED TO PLAINTIFF?S INJURIES [MIL #11]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT AND TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS THAT TRIVIAL OR REMOTE ASBESTOS EXPOSURES OR EXPOSURES NOT CONSTITUTING A SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR CONTRIBUTED TO PLAINTIFF'S INJURIES [MIL #11] (TRANSACTION ID # 16655665) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

DEFENDANTS BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND RPM, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED OR SPECIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 154

MOTION IN LIMINE # 9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED OR SPECIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 154 (TRANSACTION ID # 16653002) FILED BY DEFENDANT BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. RPM, INC.

DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM EXCEPT FOR EXPERTS

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 16663346) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.

DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED OR SPECIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 154

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 16663346) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.

EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS

EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED

Proof of Service of Summons for Defendant Bechtel Group, Inc. (Baron &

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14257907), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS SERVED MAR-01-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BECHTEL GROUP, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (B

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14260949), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS SERVED MAR-01-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preference [Code Civ. P

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE [CODE CIV. PROC. SECTION 36(A) AND (D)] (TRANSACTION ID # 15210421) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

EXHIBIT B - INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT B - INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 16298255) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

Exhibits to Declaration of Eric Brown - Part 1 (Exhibits A-I) DECLARATION OF ERIC L. BROWN [Filed concurrently with Plaintiff Martin Lujan?s Opposition to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation?s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Plaintiffs? Opposition to Defenda

EXHIBITS TO DECL OF ERIC BROWN - PART 1 (EXHIBITS A-I) DECLARATION OF ERIC L. BROWN [FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH OPPOSITION TO DEFT UNION CARBIDE CORP.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, OPPOSITION TO DEFT UNION CARBIDE CORP.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT THEREOF] (TRANSACTION ID # 16398979) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS

Notice of Association of Counsel

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 16492955): THOMAS, JOSEPH E ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Georgia-Pacific LLCs Index of Motions in Limine

INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 16582370) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.S NOTICE TO MICHAEL NICOLAI TO APPEAR AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1987 (b) AND (c)

NOTICE NOTICE TO MICHAEL NICOLAI TO APPEAR AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1987 (B) AND (C) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.S (TRANSACTION ID # 16711169)

ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-26-2007 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2007 AT 9:00 AM IN 514, FOR PLAINTIFF'S CASE. JUDGE THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., CLERK: V. MACK, REPORTERS: JOANNE FARRELL CSR 4838, CAROL KAREN CSR 8189

ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-26-2007 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2007 AT 9:00 AM IN 514, FOR PLAINTIFF'S CASE. JUDGE THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., CLERK: V. MACK, REPORTERS: JOANNE FARRELL CSR 4838, CAROL KAREN CSR 8189

360 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43499921) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES INC (AKA AND SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON WORKS AND DBA KEYSTONE BRANDED PRODUCTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2207920J011 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2107920J028 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0907A02J005 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS FEE DEPOSITED BY BARON & BUD, P.C. FOR JURY FEE FOR NOV-05-2007 THROUGH NOV-05-2008 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 514 (Fee:61.67)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18901347) AS TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18366202) AS TO DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18124503) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18100011) AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17862637) AS TO DEFENDANT T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
413 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14104458) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT S.F. GRAVEL COS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER [ASBESTOS-RELATED CASE] (TRANSACTION ID # 14062853) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14062853) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN COS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER [ASBESTOS-RELATED CASE] (TRANSACTION ID # 14062853) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14062853) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET (BARON BUDD) (TRANSACTION ID # 13962640) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES, TRAN # R0207227J007, TAG # 017653, RECEIPT NUMBER 032069, (TRANSACTION ID # 13911137) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, MARTIN ONTIVEROS AS TO DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC. , (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT) DOES 1-300 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICH-TEX, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. is a litigant