This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 18:22:38 (UTC).

MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 MARTIN GRANADOS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6472

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP INC, A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR

RCH NEWCO II, LLC (INCORRECTLY NAMED AS RCH NEWCO, II, LLC (FKA ROBERTSON-CECO CORPORATION)")

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

HARRISON DRYWALL

T.M. COBB COMPANY

WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY

V.F.T. HOLDINGS, INC.

GIAMPOLINI & CO.

F.W. SPENSER & SON, INC.

DAP, INC. (FKA DAP PRODUCTS, INC.)

DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL

PACIFC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

AMWELD INTERNATIONAL

MCMILLAN BROS. ELECTRIC, INC.

EGGERS INDUSTRIES, INC.

BALDWIN CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

103 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GARDINER, KATHERINE P.

Attorney at WFBM LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Ninth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

LOTT, CHERYL M.

Attorney at BUCHALTER NEMER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Attorney at SEDGWICK, LLP

333 Bush Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-2834

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3759

GUNTER, WILLIAM JOSEPH

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

1111 Broadway Street,, Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at HUGO PARKER, LLP

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GERAGHTY, MARK S

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3124

MAHAFFEY, MARGARET FLYNN

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Ninth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

ULLOA, EDWARD R.

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSON & YOUNG LLP

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

500 Washington Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

BURKE, JOHN ANTHONY

Attorney at BISHOP BARRY PCMARKETPLACE TOWER

6001 Shellmound St., Ste. 875

Emeryville, CA 94608

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

516 16Th Street

Oakland, CA 94612

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SOCO WEST, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ED'S AUTO SUPPLY EGGER'S INDUSTRIES WOODLAND AUTO PARTS O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (FKA CSK AUTO, INC.) INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY CAL WOOD DOOR T.M. COBB COMPANY HALEY BROTHERS (FIRE DOOR MFG.) CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE 3M COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE) ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY PACIFC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. FDCC CALFIORNIA, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SWINERTON BUILDERS PIERCE LATHING CO. (DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES) ROBERT E. MCKEE, INC. HARRISON DRYWALL TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. ROSELLO & ROSEBURG ARGUELLO CONSTRUCTION SANDBATCH FILIPPO, JOS R. SPOLIOTAS CONSTRUCTION CAL CUSTOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MCGULLICUDDY CONSTRUCTION ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC. TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. FRANK E. CONNELL & SON, INC. F.W. SPENSER & SON, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-20-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTIS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SOCO WEST, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ED'S AUTO SUPPLY EGGER'S INDUSTRIES WOODLAND AUTO PARTS O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (FKA CSK AUTO, INC.) INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY CAL WOOD DOOR T.M. COBB COMPANY HALEY BROTHERS (FIRE DOOR MFG.) CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE 3M COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE) ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY PACIFC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. FDCC CALFIORNIA, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SWINERTON BUILDERS PIERCE LATHING CO. (DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES) ROBERT E. MCKEE, INC. HARRISON DRYWALL TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. ROSELLO & ROSEBURG ARGUELLO CONSTRUCTION SANDBATCH FILIPPO, JOS R. SPOLIOTAS CONSTRUCTION CAL CUSTOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MCGULLICUDDY CONSTRUCTION ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC. TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. FRANK E. CONNELL & SON, INC. F.W. SPENSER & SON, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FO

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORD

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING CO.S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJ

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58281202) FILED BY DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING CO. (Fee:1450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE SERVED DEC-09-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE SERVED DEC-08-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY

DEFENDANT ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD. AND SCOTT CO. OF

JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. CONDITIONAL NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 58737834) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 58740224) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

Notice of Entry of Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Leave to Fi

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Complaint in Intervention

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION GRANADOS, MARTIN

Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDATS NOTICE TO NON-OPPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 58763631) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

Request for Entry of Default for defendant Cal Builders Liquidation Co

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

Statement of Damages for Plaintiff Martin Granados on behalf of defend

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FOR PLAINTIFF MARTIN GRANADOS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

Statement of Damages for Plaintiff Ruth Anna Louise Granados on behalf

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FOR PLAINTIFF RUTH ANNA LOUISE GRANADOS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

250 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FOR PLAINTIFF RUTH ANNA LOUISE GRANADOS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FOR PLAINTIFF MARTIN GRANADOS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 58771103) AS TO DEFENDANT CAL BUILDERS LIQUIDATION COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDATS NOTICE TO NON-OPPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 58763631) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION GRANADOS, MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743958) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 58740224) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. CONDITIONAL NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 58737834) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF EMILY BERGSTROM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CONDITIONAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 58734491) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. MINDOR, INC. (FKA MINTON COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
248 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE SERVED DEC-09-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE SERVED DEC-08-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE SERVED DEC-09-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58281202) FILED BY DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING CO. (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262423) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTIS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SOCO WEST, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ED'S AUTO SUPPLY EGGER'S INDUSTRIES WOODLAND AUTO PARTS O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (FKA CSK AUTO, INC.) INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY CAL WOOD DOOR T.M. COBB COMPANY HALEY BROTHERS (FIRE DOOR MFG.) CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE 3M COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE) ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY PACIFC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. FDCC CALFIORNIA, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SWINERTON BUILDERS PIERCE LATHING CO. (DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES) ROBERT E. MCKEE, INC. HARRISON DRYWALL TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. ROSELLO & ROSEBURG ARGUELLO CONSTRUCTION SANDBATCH FILIPPO, JOS R. SPOLIOTAS CONSTRUCTION CAL CUSTOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MCGULLICUDDY CONSTRUCTION ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC. TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. FRANK E. CONNELL & SON, INC. F.W. SPENSER & SON, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRANADOS, MARTIN GRANADOS, RUTH ANNA LOUISE AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SOCO WEST, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ED'S AUTO SUPPLY EGGER'S INDUSTRIES WOODLAND AUTO PARTS O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (FKA CSK AUTO, INC.) INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY ALLWOOD DOOR COMPANY CAL WOOD DOOR T.M. COBB COMPANY HALEY BROTHERS (FIRE DOOR MFG.) CALIFORNIA BUILDERS HARDWARE 3M COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE) ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY PACIFC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. FDCC CALFIORNIA, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SWINERTON BUILDERS PIERCE LATHING CO. (DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES) ROBERT E. MCKEE, INC. HARRISON DRYWALL TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. ROSELLO & ROSEBURG ARGUELLO CONSTRUCTION SANDBATCH FILIPPO, JOS R. SPOLIOTAS CONSTRUCTION CAL CUSTOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MCGULLICUDDY CONSTRUCTION ALART MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC. TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. FRANK E. CONNELL & SON, INC. F.W. SPENSER & SON, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-20-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-30-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs' Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial, And Extending Discovery Cutoff (Added To Calendar For Issuance Of Tentative Ruling Only)
Rulings:PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (Added to calendar for issuance of tentative ruling only)(Tentative ruling, continued from previous entry) If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUN-01-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, June 1, 2016 in Department 503, Line 1. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file first amended complaint is granted, conditioned on the following terms that are just pursuant to C.C.P. u00A7 473(a): If Weyerhaueser Company ("WC") and/or International Paper Company ("IP") serve written discovery on plaintiffs, the time to respond is shortened to 10 days. Within 3 court days of this hearing, plaintiffs must stipulate with WC and IP that the three people already deposed in this action (Martin, Ruth Anna Louise and James Granados) have no knowledge supporting plaintiffs' claim for punitive damages or, if they will not so stipulate, must produce the deponents for further deposition no later than June 15, 2016, limited to the issue of punitive damages. WC and IP are allowed to file motions for summary adjudication of plaintiffs' claim for punitive damages and plaintiffs must stipulate to shortened notice for such motions. The last day to hear such motions, if they are filed, is July 14, 2016 and the Court's order limiting the calendaring of summary motions to four per day in this case does not apply. As of the date of granting plaintiffs' motion, the First Amended Complaint is deemed served on all defendants who have previously appeared. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUN-22-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Of Defendant Contra Costa Electric, Inc'S
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, June 22, 2016, line 2. DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant Contra Costa Electric, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendant failed to sustain its burden of demonstrating that plaintiffs do not possess and cannot reasonably obtain evidence that Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant. Plaintiffs' argument that the stipulation for a shortened notice period has been withdrawn by their lawyer is rejected by the Court. No enforceable stipulation has been shown and even if the email correspondence is considered an enforceable stipulation, it contained no language demonstrating the intent of the parties as to whether the failure to comply with the terms of the agreement would have any consequences or penalties. Therefore defendant's motion is not denied on the basis that it failed to send plaintiffs a Word version of its Separate Statement at the time it served its moving papers. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUN-28-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, June 28, 2016, line 1. DEFENDANT JOHN F. OTTO, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant John F. Otto, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is off calendar at the moving party's request. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUN-29-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, June 29, 2016, line 1. INTERVENORS MARYLAND CASUALTY COMPANY, FIREMAN'S FUND INSUARANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Intervenors Maryland Casualty Company's and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company's, on behalf of Marconi Plastering, motion for summary judgment is denied. Intervenors failed to sustain their burden of demonstrating that plaintiffs do not possess and cannot reasonably obtain evidence that Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to Marconi. Intervenors' failure to demonstrate via Mr. Granados' deposition testimony that he has no such knowledge and plaintiffs' responses to intervenors' special interrogatories preclude intervenors from sustaining their burden under the factually devoid prong of Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826. Specifically, while intervenors addressed the UCSF site, they failed to demonstrate that the UCSF site was the only time Mr. Granados worked in the presence of Marconi employees during his career. Plaintiffs' argument that the stipulation for a shortened notice period has been withdrawn by their lawyer is rejected by the Court. No enforceable stipulation has been shown and even if the email correspondence is considered an enforceable stipulation, it contained no language demonstrating the intent of the parties as to whether the failure to comply with the terms of the agreement would have any consequences or penalties. Therefore intervenors' motion is not denied on the basis that they failed to send plaintiffs a Word version of its Separate Statement at the time it served its moving papers. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-05-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, July 5, 2016, line 1. DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant Turner Construction Company's motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendant failed to sustain its initial burden of demonstrating that Mr. Granados was not "exposed to any Turner service, asbestos-containing or otherwise." Defendant only argues proper identification of defendant's employees. Defendant failed to sustain its burden because it did not demonstrate that the UCSF Medical Center job is the only site where plaintiffs and/or their witnesses identified defendant's employees working in the presence of Mr. Granados. For this reason, Willy Mautner's declaration is irrelevant and insufficient to sustain defendant's burden of demonstrating that its employees were not present at any jobsite where Mr. Granados worked. Plaintiffs' argument that the stipulation for a shortened notice period has been withdrawn by their lawyer is rejected by the Court. No enforceable stipulation has been shown and even if the email correspondence is considered an enforceable stipulation, it contained no language demonstrating the intent of the parties as to whether the failure to comply with the terms of the agreement would have any consequences or penalties. Therefore defendant's motion is not denied on the basis that it failed to send plaintiffs a Word version of its Separate Statement at the time it served its moving papers. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-06-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, July 6, 2016, line 1. DEFENDANT D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant D. Zelinsky & Sons, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendant failed to sustain its initial burden. Defendant failed to demonstrate the two propositions upon which it bases its motion. First, it failed to demonstrate that plaintiffs have no evidence regarding when Mr. Granados worked in the presence of defendant's employees. Defense counsel's questioning at deposition and Mr. Granados' responses do not show that Mr. Granados does not know "when the plaintiff claims he was in the presence of D. Zelinsky employees allegedly sanding joint compound." Second, defendant failed to demonstrate that plaintiffs have no evidence regarding the brand name or manufacturer of the joint/taping mud defendant's employees used in the presence of Mr. Granados. On this point, defendant also failed to demonstrate that if plaintiffs could establish that work was prior to 1978, failure to identify a brand/manufacturer of the mud/joint compound is fatal to their claim that it contained asbestos. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-07-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Along With Proof Of Service
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, July 7, 2016, line 2. DEFENDANT FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication. Defendant Frederick Meiswinkel, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment and alternate motion for summary adjudication are denied. Defendant failed to sustain its initial burden under the factually devoid prong of Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826. Defendant failed to demonstrate that plaintiffs' inability to identify specific jobsites during specific years during which Mr. Granados worked in the presence of defendant's employees, and plaintiffs' inability to identify a brand/manufacturer of joint compound with which they worked, necessarily requires a conclusion that plaintiffs do not possess and cannot reasonably obtain evidence that Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-12-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, July 12, 2016, line 1. DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company's motion for summary judgment is off calendar at the moving party's request. =(503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-14-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for July 14, 2016, Thursday, in Department 503, Line 4. Defendant T.M Cobb Company's motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendant failed to sustain its initial burden under either prong of Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826. Defendant failed to sustain its burden of demonstrating that plaintiffs do not possess and cannot reasonably obtain evidence that Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant. Defendant is precluded from successfully invoking the factually devoid prong of Aguilar because: Mr. Granados testified that Cobb supplied fire doors with mineral cores to J&M; defendant admits that plaintiffs identified James Granados as a product identification witness and defendant failed to demonstrate that James does not have knowledge that Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant; defendant's Separate Statement did not cite to or rely on plaintiffs' special discovery responses in an attempt to argue they are factually devoid on the issue of asbestos content of any doors that defendant supplied to which Mr. Granados was exposed. Defendant also failed to submit affirmative evidence sufficient to negate an essential element of plaintiffs' claims. Plaintiffs' objections to Mr. Cobb's declaration are sustained as to paragraph 3. Plaintiffs' other objections are moot because no other facts from Mr. Cobb's declaration to which plaintiffs object were contained in defendant's Separate Statement. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-19-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, July 19, 2016, in Department 503, Line 1. Defendant Western Door & Sash Co.'s motion for summary judgment is continued on the court's own motion to July 21, 2016 at 1:30p.m. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-21-2016 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, July 21, 2016 in Department 503, Line 3, Defendant Western Door & Sash, Co.'s motion for summary judgment is denied. Assuming defendant sustained its initial burden under the factually devoid prong of Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826, the deposition testimony and declaration of Mr. Granados, deposition testimony of Mr. Todd and declaration of Mr. Panish create a triable issue whether Mr. Granados was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials (fire door mineral cores) attributable to defendant. Defendant's objections to the deposition testimony and declaration of Mr. Granados and the deposition testimony of Mr. Todd are overruled. Defendant's objections to the declaration of Mr. Panish are sustained as to paragraphs 9, 10 and 11 and overruled as to the remaining objections. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 2:00p.m., not 1:30 p.m., in Department 503, Hon. Joseph M. Quinn presiding. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/JMQ)


Case Number:*******6472
Case Title:MARTIN GRANADOS ET AL VS. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JAN-11-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Setting Aside Default And Default Judgment Entered Against James A. Nelson, Co., Inc.
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for January 11, 2017, Wednesday, in Department 503, Line 4. Specially appearing Century Indemnity Company's motion for an order setting aside default and default judgment entered against James A. Nelson Co., Inc. is granted. The February 29, 2016 entry of default and the October 13, 2016 default judgment entered against defendant James A. Nelson Co., Inc. are set aside. This does not affect the default judgment entered against defendants other than James A. Nelson Co., Inc. There is no opposition to the motion. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GIAMPOLINI & CO. DBA GIAMPOLINI/ARCHULETA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Baldwin Contracting Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MCMILLAN ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RCH NEWCO II LLC is a litigant