This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 04:45:43 (UTC).

MARTHA MONTALVO et al VS. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., A NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2011 MARTHA MONTALVO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC , A NEW YORK. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7760

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL

MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, F/K/A COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP, A TEXAS CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, F/D/B/A AMERICA'S WHOSALE LENDER

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AKA MERS, IS A DELAWARE CORPORATION

COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACHECO, NICK

Attorney at NICK PACHECO LAW GROUP, APC

15501 San Fernando Mission, Blvd., Ste 100

Mission Hills, CA 91345

Defendant Attorneys

PADWAY, ROBERT

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

560 Mission St, 25Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

O'REILLY, DEIRDRE ANNE

Attorney at FARBSTEIN & BLACKMAN, APC

411 Borel Ave, Ste 425

San Mateo, CA 94402

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF PENDENCY, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-04-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AKA MERS, IS A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAY-17-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AKA MERS, IS A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO AUGUST 22, 2011; STIPULATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-14-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO OCTOBER 6, 2011; STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC HEARING SET FOR FEB-08-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON JAN. 6, 2012 FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, F/D/B/A AMERICA'S WHOSALE LENDER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS (Fee:410.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-29-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEMURRER

AMENDED DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES HEARING SET FOR MAY-01-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:NO FEE)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PADWAY, ROBERT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PADWAY, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-18-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-01-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-01-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. OFF CALENDAR. A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WAS FILED APRIL 17, 2012. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. OFF CALENDAR. A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WAS FILED APRIL 17, 2012. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-30-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. A DISMISSAL WAS FILED APRIL 17, 2012. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; COURT REPORTER: SONIA WONG, CSR #11288

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, AMENDED DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL FILED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL FILED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UNABLE TO SERVE COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS MARTHA MONTALVO AND CESAR LOPEZ'S MOTION TO POSTPONE NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE. NO APPEARANCES. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: OFF CALENDAR, MOTION NOT SERVED AND FILED IN A TIMELY FASHION PER CCP 1005(B). JUDGE LORETTA M. GIORGI; REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • NTC OF MOTION TO POSTPONE NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR FEB-18-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTALVO, MARTHA ,AN INDIVIDUAL LOPEZ, CESAR ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, F/D/B/A AMERICA'S WHOSALE LENDER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, F/K/A COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP, A TEXAS CORPORATION RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AKA MERS, IS A DELAWARE CORPORATION COMMUNITY ONE FINANCIAL & REAL ESTATE SERVICES CORP. DBA COMMUNITY ONE REAL ESTATE SERVICES DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-01-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-01-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-16-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less