Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 14:35:14 (UTC).

MARSANNE WEESE et al VS. ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2010 MARSANNE WEESE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5283

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL

BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL

EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC

LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC.

NORS DAVIDSON DBA LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

San Francisco, CA 94104

TAYAC, ROBERT

NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

Cross Defendants

TAYAC, ROBERT DBA LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS, JULIA M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JULIA M. ADAMS

2358 Market Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94114

EPSTEIN, MARK

Attorney at THE EPSTEIN GROUP ATTORNEYS & COUNSELORS AT LAW

2358 Market Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendant Attorneys

LAURENSON, MICHAEL A

Attorney at GORDON & REES, LLP

275 Battery St.20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BLUM, ELTON JAY

Attorney at ELTON J.BLUM ATTORNEY AT LAW

465 California Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-15-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-10-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-01-2011 (Fee:410.00)

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-06-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-09-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE FEB-06-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DETS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYAC, ROBERT

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF SUSAN GETZ FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYAC, ROBERT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON DBA LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-03-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY NORS DAVIDSON DBA LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON ON JUL-16-2012

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-05-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON 1/9/13 AND DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1/10/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY NORS DAVIDSON DBA LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON ON JUL-16-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-03-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYAC, ROBERT JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-03-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE SEP-04-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON DBA LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2011
  • DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NTC OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-20-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INCORPORATED'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON FEBRUARY 10, 2011. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: MITCH LYON, CSR # 6840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-23-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON MAR-01-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. HEARING SET FOR FEB-24-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR MAR-01-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEESE, MARSANNE ,AN INDIVIDUAL EDMONDS, KATHLEEN ,AN INDIVIDUAL PASSADORI, DIANA ,AN INDIVIDUAL PRAGER, DEBORAH ,AN INDIVIDUAL BATTISTE, CAROLYN ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT TAYAC, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TAYAC NORS DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DBA THE LAW OFFICE OF NORS DAVIDSON LAWRENCE TAYLOR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-15-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-10-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-01-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAURENSON, MICHAEL A