Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 06:53:36 (UTC).

MARK FISHER et al VS. HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2011 MARK FISHER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HILL CO REAL ESTATE INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3358

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FISHER, MARK

CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC.

BARBAGELATA, PAUL

BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL.

HILL & COMPANY REAL ESTATE

DOES 51-75, INCLUSIVE

BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 76-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WASSERMAN, DAVID

Attorney at WASSERMAN-STERN

2960 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94109-1020

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAAS, EDWARD DONALD

Attorney at ROECA HAAS HAGER LLP

250 Montgomery St Ste. 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROECA, RUSSELL SAMUEL

Attorney at ROECA HAAS HAGER LLP

351 California St., Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

PETERSON, PETER KURT

Attorney at PETERSON MARTIN & REYNOLDS LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Tenth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT (AGAINST STEPHANIE AHLBERG)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. AHLBERG, STEPHANIE (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING (HILL & COMPANY REAL ESTATE AND STEPHANIE AHLBERG) LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (OF AHLBERG AND HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BARBAGELATA, PAUL BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY (Fee:900.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A HEARING ON A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BARBAGELATA, PAUL BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (HEARING: 8/9/12; OPPOSITION DUE BY NOON ON 8/7/12; REPLY WAIVED)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MOTION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PROOF OF SERVICE, MEMO OF PTS & AUTH., DECLARATION FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BARBAGELATA, PAUL BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR AUG-09-2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED CONTINUING TRIAL DATE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BARBAGELATA, PAUL BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF PAUL BARBAGELATA FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE HILL & COMPANY REAL ESTATE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT BARBAGELATA, PAUL BARBAGELATA REALTY COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (HEARING: 3/28/13; OPPOSITION BY 3/20/13; REPLY BY 3/25/13)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

ORDER

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-03-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 9/3/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • REVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-RESCHEDULING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-15-2013 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON SEP-03-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON MAR-28-2013 IN 206, DEFENDANT HILL & CO REAL ESTATE INC AND STEPHANIE AHLBERG'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IS GRANTED. THE TRIAL DATE OF 4/15/13 IS CONTINUED TO 9/3/13 IN DEPT. 206 AT 9:30 AM. THE NEW TRIAL DATE WILL BE DEEMED TO BE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE FOR STATUTORY CUT-OFF PURPOSES. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-22-2013 - BY COURT; NOT HELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT (AGAINST STEPHANIE AHLBERG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • STIP TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. AHLBERG, STEPHANIE (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (SERT ASIDE PER 11-25-11 ORDER) AS TO DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY SERVED AUG-18-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT AHLBERG, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY REAL ESTATE (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISHER, MARK CIRIACO-FISHER, MACY AS TO DEFENDANT HILL & CO. REAL ESTATE INC. AHLBERG, STEPHANIE DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-13-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-14-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-29-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSERMAN, DAVID