This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 03:30:18 (UTC).

MARK DOWNING et al VS. LFG INVESTMENTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2009 MARK DOWNING filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against LFG INVESTMENTS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8558

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HEBERT, LAWRENCE

DOWNING, CHERYL

DOWNING, MARK

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GAMBA, DIANE , AS TRUSTEE

LFG INVESTMENTS, INC.

DOES 1 TO 250

REESE, JOHN

Cross Defendants

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

HEBERT, LAWRENCE

DOWNING, CHERYL

DOWNING, MARK

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

ROES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

AARON, ROBERT S

Attorney at AARON & WILSON, LLP

150 Post Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94108

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN, MICHAEL BLANCHARD

Attorney at MICHAEL B. ALLEN LAW GROUP, INC.

520 South El Camino Real, Suite 840

San Mateo, CA 94402

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR APR-20-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR SEP-01-2009 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-16-2009 CONTINUED TO NOV-25-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MOVE THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT DIANE GAMBA'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (FROM 12/07/09 TO 01/05/10, TO BE HEARD IN DEPT. 301)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2010 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212,. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-26-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DIANE GAMBA AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) DIANE GAMBA, AND JOHN REESE. THE JUN-11-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE AS TO DEFENDANT LFG INVESTMENTS, INC. GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST REESE, JOHN DOES 1 TO 250

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-25-2010 CONTINUED TO DEC-06-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE OCT-25-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-06-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-24-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE DEC-06-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-06-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) DIANE GAMBA, AND JOHN REESE AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-18-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-17-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) DIANE GAMBA, AND JOHN REESE, ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-18-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE OCT-17-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-21-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-18-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT LFG INVESTMENTS, INC.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-07-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY LFG INVESTMENTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-21-2012 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED PLAINTIFF(S) AND CROSS COMPLAINT(S). ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-07-2012 AT 2:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT LFG INVESTMENTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • CONVERT COURT TRIAL, NO PAYMENT OF JURY FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY LFG INVESTMENTS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-20-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, CROSS DEFENDANTS FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY AND FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE MOVING PARTIES. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN, COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR 7077

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK SERVED AUG-06-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK SERVED AUG-06-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST HEARING SET FOR OCT-01-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ADR PACKAGE, COVER SHEET, NOTICE TO PLTF AND MEDIATION SERVICES PAMPHLET, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE SERVED AUG-26-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT REESE, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ADR PACKAGE; COVER LETTER, NOTICE TO PLTF, AND MEDIATION SERVICES PAMPHLET, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE SERVED AUG-26-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT LFG INVESTMENTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON SEP-01-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT AND COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE SERVED AUG-06-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR SEP-01-2009 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOWNING, MARK DOWNING, CHERYL HEBERT, LAWRENCE AS TO DEFENDANT LFG INVESTMENTS, INC. GAMBA, DIANE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR THE DIANE J. GAMBA TRUST REESE, JOHN DOES 1 TO 250 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-16-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-20-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-01-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.