This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 06:31:25 (UTC).

MARK DESOTO VS. DCO LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 MARK DESOTO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against DCO LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CYNTHIA M. LEE and PANG LY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6917

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

CYNTHIA M. LEE

PANG LY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO

DESOTO, MARK

LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

Defendants

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BERGLUND TRACTOR

CATERPILLAR INC.

CRANE CO

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

DCO LLC (FKA DANA COMPANIES, LLC)

DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HENRY COMPANY LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. F/K/A ALLIED SIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

HUGO, EDWARD R

JOHNSON, DEREK S.

HUIE, JEREMY D.

WONG, ALICE

BAILEY, BOBBIE R.

Other Attorneys

BARBER, STEVEN J.

CALARESO, CHRISTINE U D

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68768060) PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO CRANE CO. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68768060) PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO CRANE CO. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68689604) ESCH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68689604) ESCH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DES

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND A

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , A

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEAT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR CONTAINED THEREIN (TRANSACTION ID # 68366758) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

ORDER - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DONALD DESOTO IS APPOINTED AS THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELYN DESOTO)

ORDER - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DONALD DESOTO IS APPOINTED AS THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELYN DESOTO)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 67819938) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER C

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 67819938) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67809905) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67809905) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS ATTACHING LETTERS FROM PAULINE MARIEFEL SEGUBAN, M.D AND ARLENE LAURIE BROWN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67809905) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST T

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS ATTACHING LETTERS FROM PAULINE MARIEFEL SEGUBAN, M.D AND ARLENE LAURIE BROWN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67809905) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67753339)EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67753339)EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67521697), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONAL

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67521697), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED SERVED JAN-14-2022, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68768060) PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO CRANE CO. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68689604) ESCH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68616064) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W0622C06M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 68514536) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK DESOTO, DONALD , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED DESOTO, MADELYN , BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DONALD DESOTO DESOTO, BEVERLY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, RICHARD AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED LONG, CHRISTINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF MARK DESOTO, DECEASED; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66514911) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 66514911) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66514911) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; Fee: $1450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 66502518) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66502518) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY COMPANY LLC; Fee: $1450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 66482125) AS TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: H4121317F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DESOTO, MARK AS TO DEFENDANT DCO LLC (FKA DANA COMPANIES, LLC) ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY WARREN PUMPS LLC IMO INDUSTRIES INC. AURORA PUMP COMPANY HENRY COMPANY LLC CATERPILLAR INC. STERLING ENGINE COMPANY BERGLUND TRACTOR THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC. DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-17-2022 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less