Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 04:23:44 (UTC).

MARK CLEMENS VS. U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2011 MARK CLEMENS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2745

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL

U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOMMERS, STEPHEN A.

Attorney at KUMIN SOMMERS LLP

870 Market Street, Ste 428

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

HURSH, JOHN GREGORY

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

305 Lytton Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-23-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-23-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-08-2011 (Fee:410.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-27-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED NOTICE TO PLNTF. SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-26-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED BY MAIL, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-12-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY TO DEFT'S OPPOS TO OPLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY TO DEFT'S OPPOS TO PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY TO DEFTS OPPOS TO PLTF'S DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY TO DEFTS OPPOS TO PLTF'S REQUERSTDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF PL,TF'S MARK CLEMENS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ROBERT M ALEO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ROBERT M ALEO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-29-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATUS STATEMENT REGARDING CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ARBITRATION STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ALL COUNSEL SET FOR DEC-18-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT(S) RE: ARBITRATION STATUS. THE OCT-31-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RESPONSE TO OSC RE: ARBITRATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. THE DEC-18-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RESPONSE TO OSC RE: ARBITRATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ALL COUNSEL SET FOR DEC-18-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT(S) RE: ARBITRATION STATUS. THE OCT-31-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS STATEMENT REGARDING CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ARBITRATION STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-29-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-23-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-29-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING DEFENDANT U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON (DEFENDANT U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA) MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (AND STAY ACTION) [GRANTED]

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) AND MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION ; SEPERATE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR NOV-09-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR NOV-09-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION AND DISMISS PAGA ALLEGATIONS; TABLE OF NON-CAL AUTHORITIES, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR NOV-16-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • POS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED BY MAIL, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-12-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED NOTICE TO PLNTF. SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-26-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUL-27-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEMENS, MARK ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT U-HAUL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ABORDO, DANTE , AN INDIVIDUAL KRUGER, JOSEPH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-23-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-23-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-08-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOMMERS, STEPHEN A.