Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 10:47:11 (UTC).

MARK CIANO VS. HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2010 MARK CIANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC ,A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6085

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIANO, MARK

Defendants

SALDARRIAGA, ALEX

HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBERSON, JOEL K.

Attorney at LIBERSON & WOLFORD LLP

660 Market Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

PRATT, STACEY LEIGH

Attorney at STRAZULO FITZGERALD, LLP

275 Battery St, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK AS TO DEFENDANT HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SALDARRIAGA, ALEX DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-16-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-03-2010 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK SERVED JAN-20-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK SERVED JAN-20-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2010 CONTINUED TO JUL-30-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE ORDER GRANTING ARBITRATION AND STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • FEE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2010 CONTINUED TO JUL-30-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE ORDER GRANTING ARBITRATION AND STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • LAW AND MOTION, 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANTS ALEX SALDARRIAGA AND HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INCORPORATED'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION GRANTED ON MARCH 16, 2010. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189 301/PJB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-01-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, DEFENDANTS ALEX SALDARRIAGA AND HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INCORPORATED'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED; ARBITRATION IS COMPELLED AND THIS LITIGATION IS STAYED PENDING ARBITRATION. PLAINTIFF'S AGREEMENT INCLUDED THIS DISPUTE, AND THE AGREEMENT CAN ONLY BE READ TO MANDATE COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA LAW PROHIBITING IMPOSITION OF ARBITRATION COSTS ON PLAINTIFF. THEREFORE, PLAINTIFF HAS AGREED TO ARBITRATE, AND THE AGREEMENT IS NOT SUBSTANTIVELY UNCONSCIONABLE. MOVING PARTY IS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2010
  • DECLARATION OF MARK CIANO IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S OPPOS. TO DEFT'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRATT STACEY L ON MAR-08-2010 THROUGH MAR-24-2010 FILED BY DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NTC OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-22-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • NTC OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:780.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK SERVED JAN-20-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SALDARRIAGA, ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK SERVED JAN-20-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CIANO, MARK AS TO DEFENDANT HOME HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SALDARRIAGA, ALEX DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-16-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-03-2010 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less