Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 09:28:20 (UTC).

MARION BANKS VS. BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2015 MARION BANKS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9507

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

Defendants

DOES 1-10

BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE

BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW K.

Attorney at PAYNE & FEARS LLP

One Post Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-20-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-16-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-28-2016 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) HEARING SET FOR MAR-17-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:370.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1) DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1) DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; AND 2) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58486741) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE DOES 1-10

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL

DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMEN

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) HEARING SET FOR MAY-24-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58811852) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-20-2016 CONTINUED TO JUL-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-20-2016 CONTINUED TO JUL-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58811852) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58779448) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) HEARING SET FOR MAY-24-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AT THE MOVING PARTIES' REQUEST. (D302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58486741) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1) DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; AND 2) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. BLACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKETS DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16025042) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATION (SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE) HEARING SET FOR MAR-17-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANKS, MARION , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BOSTON MARKET CORPORATE OFFICE DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-20-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-16-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-28-2016 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Market Corporation is a litigant