This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 01:01:17 (UTC).

MARIO ANGELO MARINO ET AL VS. SELENE FINANCE LP

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 MARIO ANGELO MARINO filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SELENE FINANCE LP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE TONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6269

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE TONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIANO, ADI BARAK

San Francisco, CA 94115

MARINO, MARIO ANGELO

San Francisco, CA 94115

Defendant

SELENE FINANCE LP

9990 Richmond Ave., Ste. 400 S

Houston, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $9,000.00 FILED BY MARINO, MARIO ANGELO MARIANO, ADI BARAK AS TO DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE LP ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JAN-11-2023 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $125. SERVED NOV-30-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE LP

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORIGNAL SUBPOENA. SERVICE FEE $62.50

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE [DOCUMENT STAMPED: 'BY FAX'] CLAIM HEARING OF JAN-11-2023 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM Off Calendar Dec-20-2022 Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: MICHELLE TONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE [DOCUMENT STAMPED: 'BY FAX'] CLAIM HEARING OF JAN-11-2023 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORIGNAL SUBPOENA. SERVICE FEE $62.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $125. SERVED NOV-30-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO SELENE FINANCE LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialPayment: SMALL CLAIMS > 5000; Amount: $75; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0522B15S005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $9,000.00 FILED BY MARINO, MARIO ANGELO MARIANO, ADI BARAK AS TO DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE LP ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JAN-11-2023 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506; Fee: $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant