This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 08:37:16 (UTC).

MARIE BACCHUS TAYLOR et al VS. DAVID SHEPARD et al (Cross-Complainant Richard Reese 170.6CCP to Judge Stewart)

Case Summary

On 03/06/2012 MARIE BACCHUS TAYLOR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVID SHEPARD Cross-Complainant Richard Reese 170 6CCP to Judge Stewart. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8876

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL

BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL

BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BANANA BUG LLC

SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Defendants

ROSE 1-100, INCLUSIVE

BANANA BUG LLC

SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL

SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROOD, STEVEN JAY

Attorney at FINANCIAL CENTER BUILDING

405-14Th Street, Suite 212

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CANTOR, ANDREW

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW S. CANTOR

673 Brannan Street, #509

San Francisco, CA 94107

GALANIS, JARED M

LIDDICOAT, BRIAN D.

MIYAKE, STEVEN SHUNZO

One Embarcadero Center,, No. 1020

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MIYAKE, STEVEN SHUNZO

One Embarcadero Center,, No. 1020

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND APPOINTING REFEREE . FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:40.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN ROOD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND APPOINTING RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND APPOINTING REFEREE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR JUN-28-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF DAVID SHEPARD RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF BRIAN LIDDICOAT RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS; OPPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF BRIAN LIDDICOAT; DECLARATION OF DAVID SHEPARD FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

STIPULATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:20.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING, BASED ON THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES, THE INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:60.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-21-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:410.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CROSS-COMPLAINANT RICHARD REESE'S TRIAL BRIEF SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CROSS-COMPLAINANT RICHARD REESE'S TRIAL BRIEF RE PARTNERSHIP DUTIES SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CROSS-COMPLAINT RICHARD REESE'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE THREE FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL BANANA BUG LLC RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC ROSE 1-100, INCLUSIVE

ORDER

ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT DAVID SHEPARD

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT DAVID SHEPARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, CROSS DEFENDANT DAVID SHEPARD'S MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS HELD IN TRUST IS GRANTED. FUNDS SHOULD BE RELEASE TO CROSS-DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $71,000.05. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312(B). JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, CLERK: M. OLOPERNES, NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-19-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DECLARATION OF STEVEN S. MIYAKE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FILED BY DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS; POINTS AND AUTHORITITES IN SUPPORT FILED BY DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS HELD IN TRUST, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINANT RICHARD REESE'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE FILED BY DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT RICHARD REESE'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE THREE FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL BANANA BUG LLC RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC ROSE 1-100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-29-2014 - ALL PARTIES APPEAR. CASE IS DISMISSED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT/DEFENDANT RICHARD REESE. JUDGE: HON. RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.; CLERK MARJORIE L. MANZELLA; NOT REPORTED (DEPT. 306).

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL BANANA BUG LLC RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC ROSE 1-100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-21-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-21-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-22-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BANANA BUG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-22-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-22-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAYLOR, MARIE BACCHUS AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, RICARDO AN INDIVIDUAL BACCHUS, EDMOND AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT SHEPARD, DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL SHEPARD, RANDI AN INDIVIDUAL REESE, RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL BANANA BUG LLC RAIZEL SYDELL ENTERPRISES LLC DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-08-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-07-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-24-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less