This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/22/2019 at 01:35:36 (UTC).

MARIA VALERIE DE LEON D.D.S VS. CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 MARIA VALERIE DE LEON D D S filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTIAAN J NIP, D D S , INC . This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0944

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LEON D.D.S, MARIA VALERIE

Defendants

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., D/B/A SAN ANTONIO DENTAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NIP, D.D.S., CHARLES C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOHN, DAVID D

Attorney at SOHN LEGAL GROUP P.C.

20 Haight Street,, Suite 101

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DE LEON D.D.S, MARIA VALERIE AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., D/B/A SAN ANTONIO DENTAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE NIP, D.D.S., CHARLES C. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-22-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-21-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-30-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $600; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1019B21F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DE LEON D.D.S, MARIA VALERIE AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., D/B/A SAN ANTONIO DENTAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE NIP, D.D.S., CHARLES C. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-22-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-21-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-30-2020 (Fee:$600.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0944
Case Title:MARIA VALERIE DE LEON D.D.S VS. CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., ET AL
Court Date:MAR-26-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Approval Of Settlement Of Claim For Civil Penalties Under Labor Code 2698 Et Seq.
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Friday, March 26, 2021, Line 5,PLAINTIFF MARIA DE LEON D.D.S' Motion For Approval Of Settlement Of Claim For Civil Penalties Under Labor Code 2698 Et Seq.:Plaintiff Valerie De Leon's unopposed "motion for approval of settlement of claim for civil penalties under Labor Code sec. 2698 et seq." is granted.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the plaintiff is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.=(302/RBU)


Case Number:*******0944
Case Title:MARIA VALERIE DE LEON D.D.S VS. CHRISTIAAN J. NIP, D.D.S., INC., ET AL
Court Date:JUN-05-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Unopposed Motion And Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, June 5, 2020, Law & Motion, Line 4, PLAINTIFF MARIA DE LEON D.D.S' Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint.Plaintiff Maria Valerie De Leon's unopposed motion for leave to amend complaint is granted. The amended complaint shall be filed on or before June 15, 2020; it is not "deemed filed."In light of the current public health emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear telephonically. Telephone appearances must be arranged in advance through Court Call by calling 1-888-88-COURT. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for plaintiff is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/RBU)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sohn, David D