Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 02:29:04 (UTC).

MARCO LOBASCIO VS. CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2011 MARCO LOBASCIO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2293

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBASCIO, MARCO

Defendants

FIRST LANDMARK, LLC, PREVIOUSLY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 2-75, INCLUSIVE

CHRISTINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE AKA FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDAL

DOES 1 TO 75, INCL.

SELECTIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC, AKA SBS LLC AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA AN INDIVIDUAL

FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE, A/K/A CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE, A/K/A FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL AND THE ESTATE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE, A/K/A FLORENTIN DRAGHIA

SAMOY, JOCELYN

FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE

FIRST LANDMARK LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SELECTIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC A/K/A SBS, LLC, PREVIOUSLY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZOFF, KENNETH SCOTT

Attorney at KATZOFF & RIGGS

1500 Park Avenue, Suite 300

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorneys

RUIZ, S. DEAN

Attorney at HARRIS, PERISHO & RUIZ

3439 Brookside Road, Ste. 210

Stockton, CA 95219

PAGANELLI, CARL

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

100 N. Wiget Lane, Ste 150

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

VEILUVA, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at ALBORG, VEILUVA & MATRIN LLP

2121 N California Blvd Ste1010

Wqalnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-26-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHRISTINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE AKA FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-18-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED AUG-15-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-18-2011 ON DEFENDANT CHRISTINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE AKA FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE COMPLAINT'S 12TH CAUSE OF ACTION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE COMPLAINT'S 12TH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFT NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

REPLY

REPLY TO PLTF'S OPPOS TO MOTIONS TO STIRKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS CHICAGO COMPANY AND JOCELYN SAMOY TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA AN INDIVIDUAL SELECTIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC, AKA SBS LLC AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SAMOY, JOCELYN FIRST LANDMARK LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE, A/K/A CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE, A/K/A FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL AND THE ESTATE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE, A/K/A FLORENTIN DRAGHIA DOES 2-75, INCLUSIVE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-27-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-16-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECTIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC A/K/A SBS, LLC, PREVIOUSLY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FIRST LANDMARK, LLC, PREVIOUSLY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:820.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-17-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-25-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2012
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-17-2012 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 8/20/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STATEMENT RE MEDIATION SERVICES OF THE BASF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE ELEVENETH THROUGH FOURTEENTH CAUSES OF ACTION THEREOF AS TO DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-17-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-25-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLORENTINE, CHRISTINE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-25-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE APR-23-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2011
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-20-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-14-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-14-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-27-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAMOY, JOCELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-18-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-26-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHRISTINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE AKA FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT \ FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO SERVED JUL-26-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOBASCIO, MARCO AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISITINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTINE FLORENTINE AKA CHRISTINE DRAGHIA, AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DANIEL FLORENTINE AKA FLORENTIN DRAGHIA, A DECEASED INDIVIDAL SELECTIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC, AKA SBS LLC AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SAMOY, JOCELYN NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 75, INCL. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-09-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-06-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-28-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZOFF, KENNETH S.