Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 18:56:40 (UTC).

MARCELINO FALCON CHAN VS. FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/22/2010 MARCELINO FALCON CHAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FS S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1857

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON

San Franciso, CA 94103

Defendant and Respondent

FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

1668 Haight St.

San Francisco, CA 941172816

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

URIARTE, ARLO GARCIA

Attorney at LIBERATION LAW GROUP, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WEBB, MATTHEW JOHN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J. WEBB

409 13Th Street, 17Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONSCOLLECTION UNIT

455 Golden Gate Ave.,10Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial (Labor Appeal)

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-12-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2010 1:30 PM

MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2010 1:30 PM

Order to Continue Hearing

COURT TRIAL SET FOR NOV-02-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-08-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 504 DUE TO JUDGE DOUGLASS' UNAVAILABILITY

MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-13-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-13-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-15-2010 10:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-15-2010 10:00 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2011 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2011 9:30 AM

STATEMENT OF DECISION

STATEMENT OF DECISION

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $4,516.00 PRINCIPAL, $5,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,185.38 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,701.38, SEE SCANNED DOC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $4,516.00 PRINCIPAL, $5,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,185.38 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,701.38, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $5,995.75 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE MAR-26-2011, FILED BY APPELLANT CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $5,995.75 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE MAR-14-2011, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON FEB-23-2011 IN DEPT. 414, NTC OF MTN AND MTN FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES COSTS GRANTED AS TO ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000. COSTS BILL TO BE SUBMITTED. JUDGE: WALLACE P. DOUGLASS; REPORTER: MELANIE GHENO; CLERK: DON FEINBERG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:731.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 206, NTC OF MTN AND MTN FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES COSTS CONTINUED FROM FEB-23-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT FEB-23-2011, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 414, JUDGE DOUGLASS. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2011 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR NOV-08-2010 CONTINUED TO DEC-13-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 504 FOR COURT TRIAL. JUDGE WALLACE DOUGLASS; CLERK: D. FEINBERG; REPORTER: ANGIE DINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • TRIAL BRIEF PLAINIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2010 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR NOV-02-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-08-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 504 DUE TO JUDGE DOUGLASS' UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-12-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-02-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 504 FOR PLAINTIFF'S CASE IN A LABOR APPEAL. JUDGE: W. DOUGLASS; CLERK: R. GOULDING; REPORTER: A. DINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2010 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF OCT-12-2010 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON OCT-12-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 504, WALLACE P DOUGLASS. JUDGE: JAMES J. MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-12-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY APPELLANT CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY APPELLANT CHAN, MARCELINO FALCON AS TO RESPONDENT FS&S CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less