Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:14 (UTC).

MARC VEZINA et al VS. ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 MARC VEZINA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ULTRATICK INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8481

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERGAMO, CAROLYN

BERGAMO, GRANT

CHUN, LANI

DUMAS, ALAN

DUMAS, LAURA

MANZA, DAN

PUCCINI, KEN

VEZINA, MARC

Defendants

SHARMA, SEAN

ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, MARC R.

Attorney at LEWIS & LLEWELLYN LLP

71 Stevenson Street, Suite 825

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, TIMOTHY TULLY

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 400

Redwood Shores,, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC CHUN, LANI BERGAMO, GRANT BERGAMO, CAROLYN DUMAS, ALAN DUMAS, LAURA MANZA, DAN PUCCINI, KEN AS TO DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHARMA, SEAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT GKL CORPORATE, 915 L STREET, SACRAMENTO, CA 95814 FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT 1 MARKET ST , SPEAR TOWER ,36TH FLOOR, SAN FRANISCO, CA, 94105 FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SHARMA, SEAN

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY LEWIS, MARC R.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN (Fee:900.00)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-16-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY LEWIS, MARC R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT 1 MARKET ST , SPEAR TOWER ,36TH FLOOR, SAN FRANISCO, CA, 94105 FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SHARMA, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT GKL CORPORATE, 915 L STREET, SACRAMENTO, CA 95814 FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC SERVED FEB-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHARMA, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VEZINA, MARC CHUN, LANI BERGAMO, GRANT BERGAMO, CAROLYN DUMAS, ALAN DUMAS, LAURA MANZA, DAN PUCCINI, KEN AS TO DEFENDANT ULTRATICK INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SHARMA, SEAN SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less