This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:57:20 (UTC).

MANUEL MEZA et al VS. ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2007 MANUEL MEZA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4477

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEZA, MANUEL

WARREN, BONNIE MEZA

Defendants

BHP TRADING INC.

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS DOE 4

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

INDEPENDENT FOUNDRY SUPPLY CO

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMSLER-MORTON WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COST

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMSLER-MORTON

ICF KAISER INTERNATIONAL, INC.

KAISER VENTURES LLC AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH AND INTO KAISER VENTURES, INC. AND INCORRECTLY NAMED AS SUCCESSOR TO KAISER ENGINEERS, INC.

W.P. KEITH CO.

FOUNDRY SERVICE & SUPPLIES, INC.

RILEY POWER, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND DB RILEY, INC.

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (SUED HEREIN AS USX CORPORATION)

VIACOM, INCORPORATED AS SBM TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC ORPORATION

THERMAL CERAMICS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO INTERNATIONAL VERMICULITE

ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

BROKEN HILL PROPRIETARY (USA) INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BRUMLEY-DONALDSON

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

45 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAISER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at LEVIN SIMES KAISER & GORNICK LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 36Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

KEARNEY, SANDRA A

Attorney at FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP

235 Montgomery Street,17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

RITCHIE, HUGH JAMES

Attorney at HUGH J. RITCHIE

6055 E. Washington Blvd, Suite 1032

Los Angeles, CA 90040

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCLEOD, BRUCE EDWIN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLASPY & GLASPY, INC.

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 75O

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PARK, ERNIE ZACHARY

Attorney at BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER LLP

13215 East Penn Street, Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602-1797

MURPHY, PAUL DAVID

Attorney at MURPHY ROSEN & MEYLAN LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1142

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

TROPO, SCOTT T

Attorney at TROPIO & MORLAN

21700 Oxnard St., Ste 1700

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

MORTL, ANDREW T

Attorney at GLYNN & FINLEY

100 Pringle Ave, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

AUBERT, GARTH W.

Attorney at MENDES & MOUNT LLP

445 South Figueroa St. 38Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WALLACE, JOHN ROBERT

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, P.O. Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18084854) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Defendant Ferro Corporation, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Electro Refractories and Abrasives to Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18094054) FILED BY DEFENDANT FERRO CORPORATION, SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ELECTRO REFRACTORIES AND ABRASIVES (Fee:335.00)

Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Foseco, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18517666) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

Notice of Entry of Order - Denying Defendant Foseco, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - DENYING DEFT FOSECO, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18814152) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEASED PLAINTIFF AND TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEASED PLTF AND TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLT (TRANSACTION ID # 20249067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE HEARING SET FOR JUL-14-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO APPOINT BRIGITTE MEZA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEASED PLAINTIFF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO APPOINT BRIGITTE MEZA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEASED PLTF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLT (TRANSACTION ID # 20249067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21027262) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE MEZA, BRIGITTE, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF MANUEL MEZA, DECEDENT WARREN, BONNIE MEZA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET A STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE DATE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLNTF'S MOTIN TO SET A STATUS SETTING CONFERENCE(TRANSACTION ID # 21468166) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE MEZA, BRIGITTE, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF MANUEL MEZA, DECEDENT WARREN, BONNIE MEZA

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE BY COURIER HAND DELIVERY REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE BY COURIER HAND DELIVERY REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27322780) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18115409) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS BURAKOW, Ph. D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.S (improperly sued as Kaiser Engineers and Constructor, Inc., individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Kaiser Engineers, Inc.) MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS BURAKOW, PH. D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.S (IMPROPERLY SUED AS KAISER ENGINEERS AND CONSTRUCTOR, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KAISER ENGINEERS, INC.) MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18374534) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. IMPROPERLY SUED AS KAISER ENGINEERS AND CONSTRUCTOR, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KAISER ENGINEERS, INC. AND ICF KAISER INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Declaration of T. Scott Hames in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Foseco, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint and Exhibits

DECLARATION OF T. SCOTT HAMES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT FOSECO, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 18548709) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 18655784) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXOMET, INC.

DECLARATION OF JESSICA N. BIERNIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO APPOINT BRIGITTE MEZA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEASED PLAINTIFF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JESSICA N. BIERNIER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO APPOINT BRIGITTE MEZA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEASED PLTF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLT (TRANSACTION ID # 20249067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

DECLARATION OF JESSICA N. BIERNIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET A STATUS AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE

DECLARATION OF JESSICA N. BIERNIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET A STATUS AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 21027262) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE MEZA, BRIGITTE, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF MANUEL MEZA, DECEDENT WARREN, BONNIE MEZA

GENERAL DENIAL ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21131173) FILED BY DEFENDANT OTTO H. ROSENTRETER CO.

Request for Dismissal of Defendant American Optical Corporation

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25855891) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32399238)

180 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35324763) AS TO DEFENDANT CSR, LTD AKA COLONIAL REFINERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010. OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32399238)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. DISMISSAL IS PENDING IN LEXISNEXIS. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF THE FILING IS ACCEPTED BY THE NEXT HEARING DATE. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 32369714)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ; ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 32335561)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32264365) AS TO DEFENDANT EXOMET, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28997280) AS TO DEFENDANT SOCO-WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO WESTERN CHEMICAL & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS. CASE SET FOR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON APR-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. ATTORNEY BIERNIER REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT THIS CASE HAS RESOLVED. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
198 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18114975) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18109180) FILED BY DEFENDANT EARTH TECH, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18094054) FILED BY DEFENDANT FERRO CORPORATION, SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ELECTRO REFRACTORIES AND ABRASIVES (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18084854) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18031214) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18006364) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOCO WEST, INC., FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17878981) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC., (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALTERNATE ENTITY OF RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND DB RILEY, INC.) (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEZA, MANUEL MEZA, BRIGITTE AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-500, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less