This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 08:33:23 (UTC).

MANDEEP S. DHILLON VS. ROGER BARNETT et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2013 MANDEEP S DHILLON filed an Other lawsuit against ROGER BARNETT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9555

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DHILLON, MANDEEP S.

DHILLON, PARVEEN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BARNETT, ROGER

BARNETT, SLOAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DHILLON, HARMEET K.

Attorney at DHILLON & SMITH LLP

177 Post St. Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN SERVED MAY-13-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-10-2013 ON CROSS DEFENDANT DHILLON, PARVEEN

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DHILLON, MANDEEP S. DHILLON, PARVEEN

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER BARNETT, SLOAN (Fee:900.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. SERVED MAR-18-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. SERVED MAR-18-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT BARNETT, SLOAN

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. AS TO DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER BARNETT, SLOAN SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2013 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN SERVED MAY-13-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-10-2013 ON CROSS DEFENDANT DHILLON, PARVEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BARNETT, SLOAN AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DHILLON, MANDEEP S. DHILLON, PARVEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER BARNETT, SLOAN (Fee:900.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. SERVED MAR-18-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. SERVED MAR-18-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT BARNETT, SLOAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DHILLON, MANDEEP S. AS TO DEFENDANT BARNETT, ROGER BARNETT, SLOAN SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less