This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:32:04 (UTC).

MAEVE REID et al VS. AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2007 MAEVE REID filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4408

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

THE OCEANIC STEAMSHIP COMPANY

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION

SB DECKING, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORP, FKA VIACOM SUCCESSOR TO CBS CORP FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

KEYSTONE SHIPPING COMPANY

WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD

SL SERVICE, INC.

CEMEX, INC., THE SUCCESSOR OF MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Attorney at EMARD, DANNOFF, PORT, TAMULSKI & PAETZOLD, LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

NEBEL, JAMES BARTON

Attorney at FLYNN, DELICH & WISE LLP

One California Street,, Suite 350

San Francisco, CA 94111

VASQUEZ, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Ste. 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

Other Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

100 Pringle Ave. Ste. 750

Walnut Creek, CA 945960000

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

MCMAHAN, TROY DEAN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

1999 Harrison Street, 18Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

CLAPPER, JACK KENT

Attorney at CLAPPER, PATTI, SCHWEIZER & MASONMARINA OFFICE PLAZA

2330 Marinship Way, Suite 140

Sausalito, CA 94965

MCLEOD, BRUCE EDWIN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17950605) FILED BY DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT; STIP AND ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 21776265) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21888797) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

Declaration of David R. Boyajian in Support of Defendants Motion to Vacate, or, in the Alternative, Continue, the Trial Date

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. BOYAJIAN IN SUPPORT OF MO TO VACATE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE, THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 24846988) FILED BY DEFENDANT MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. SL SERVICE, INC. KEYSTONE SHIPPING COMPANY INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

American President Lines, Ltd.s Joinder in Defendants Motion to Vacate or, in the Alternative, Continue, the Trial Date; Proof of Service

JOINDER IN DEFTS'S MO TO VACATE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE, THE TRIAL DATE; PROOF OF SERVICE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24869526) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

Declaration of Charles R. Cushing, PH.D., P.E., In Support of Texaco Marine Services, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

DECLARATION OF CHARLES R. CUSHING, PH.D., P.E., IN SUPPORT OF TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 24944495) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC.

Re-Notice of Hearing Date re Texaco Marine Services Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING DATE RE TEXACO MARINE SERVICES HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25148288) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-11-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

[Errata] Exhibits D to H of Declaration of Troy D. McMahan in Support of Texaco Marines MSJ

[ERRATA] EXHIBITS D TO H OF DECLARATION OF TROY D. MCMAHAN IN SUPPORT OF TEXACO MARINES MSJ (TRANSACTION ID # 25148288) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC.

[Errata] Exhibits I to M of Declaration of Troy D. McMahan in Support of Texaco Marines MSJ

[ERRATA] EXHIBITS I TO M OF DECLARATION OF TROY D. MCMAHAN IN SUPPORT OF TEXACO MARINES MSJ (TRANSACTION ID # 25148288) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC.

DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF MAEVE REIDS COMPLAINT.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25208240) AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25288282)

Exhibits F-M To: Declaration of Christine A. Renken in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Farrell Lines Incorporateds Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [C.C.P. Section 418.10]

EXHIBITS F-M TO: DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO FARRELL LINES INCORPORATEDS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [C.C.P. SECTION 418.10] (TRANSACTION ID # 26879876) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REID, MAEVE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOHN REID REID, MARCUS REID, BARRY

Notice of Errata re Missing Exhibit Page Re: Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Farrell Lines Incorporateds Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [C.C.P. Section 418.10]

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE MISSING EXHIBIT PAGE RE: PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO FARRELL LINES INCORPORATEDS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [C.C.P. SECTION 418.10] (TRANSACTION ID # 26909367) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REID, MAEVE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOHN REID REID, MARCUS REID, BARRY

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FARRERLL LINES INCORPORATED'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Defendant International Shipholding Corporations Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27933887) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

Declaration of Dennis J. Paustenbach in Support of Maritime Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication

DECLARATION OF DENNIS J. PAUSTENBACH IN SUPPORT OF MARITIME DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27928219) FILED BY DEFENDANT SL SERVICE, INC. KEYSTONE SHIPPING COMPANY WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

Part 2 of Exhibits to Declaration of Dennis J. Paustenbach in Support of Maritime Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication

PART 2 OF EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF DENNIS J. PAUSTENBACH IN SUPPORT OF MARITIME DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27928219) FILED BY DEFENDANT SL SERVICE, INC. KEYSTONE SHIPPING COMPANY WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

Declaration of Dennis J. Paustenbach in Support of Matson Navigation Company, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication

DECLARATION OF DENNIS J. PAUSTENBACH IN SUPPORT OF MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 28010949) FILED BY DEFENDANT MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.

249 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT THE DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION IS PENDING IN LEXISNEXIS. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33503056)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 31375227) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REID, MAEVE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOHN REID REID, MARCUS REID, BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-27-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31278861) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A126688 #5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31027573) AS TO DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 30960888) FILED BY DEFENDANT MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. KEYSTONE SHIPPING COMPANY WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL SHIPHOLDING CORPORATION SL SERVICE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
279 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17950605) FILED BY DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17947963) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17945919) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17923247) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17893160) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17745333) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOCO WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17657521) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF REID, MAEVE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOHN REID REID, MARCUS REID, BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REID, MAEVE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOHN REID REID, MARCUS REID, BARRY AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY CBS CORPORATION CRANE CO. DOES ONE THROUGH SEVENTY-FIVE INCLUSIVE ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE ATTACHED SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-15-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less