Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 19:21:12 (UTC).

M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA VS. ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2011 M HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1016

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION

ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA AHI, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A PURPORTED OHIO CORPORATION

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A PUBLIC ENTITY

THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, ("ASHBURY") ERRONEOUSLY NAMED ASBURY HOMES, INC., DBA AHI

Cross Defendants

HINTON-BORN, NICOLE

ECONOMY TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BORN, KEVIN GREGORY

M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1 TO 75

ROES 1 -10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LEONIDOU, JANETTE G

Attorney at LEONIDOU & ROSIN, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

777 Cuesta Drive, Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SOSA, CARLOS E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA, LLP

18757 Burbank Boulevard, Suite 305

Tarzana, CA 91356-6329

MCINERNEY, TIMOTHY LENANE

Attorney at MCINERNEY & DILLION,P.C.

1999 Harrison Street, 17Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

GUIBERT, GUSTIN R.

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYFOX PLAZA

1390 Market St, Ste 425

San Francisco, CA 94102

HERRERA, DENNIS JOSE

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

1390 Market Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

TAN, TERESA

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING SERVED MAY-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A PUBLIC ENTITY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, ("ASHBURY") ERRONEOUSLY NAMED ASBURY HOMES, INC., DBA AHI (Fee:410.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-28-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT HINTON-BORN, NICOLE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING JURY DEMANDED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED BY DEFENDANT THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A PURPORTED OHIO CORPORATION ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, ("ASHBURY") ERRONEOUSLY NAMED ASBURY HOMES, INC., DBA AHI

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO M HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION INC.'S MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, ("ASHBURY") ERRONEOUSLY NAMED ASBURY HOMES, INC., DBA AHI

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF BRIAN M JUNGINGER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS. TO M HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION INC.'S MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, ("ASHBURY") ERRONEOUSLY NAMED ASBURY HOMES, INC., DBA AHI

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GUIBERT, GUSTIN R. SUBSTITUTED FOR TAN, TERESA AS ATTORNEY FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, AS TO DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY,

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-22-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA AHI, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-22-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-11-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-22-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY TO DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINT OR FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT(S) RE: TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, AS TO DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-06-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-11-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS RE: CROSS COMPLAINTS AND TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING SERVED MAY-19-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A PURPORTED OHIO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING SERVED JUN-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA AHI, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING SERVED JUN-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING SERVED MAY-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF M. HERNANDEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS HERNANDEZ ENGINEERING AS TO DEFENDANT ASHBURY GENERAL CONTRACTING AND ENGINEERING, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ASHBURY HOMES, INC. DBA AHI, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A PUBLIC ENTITY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A PURPORTED OHIO CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-14-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-29-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonidou, Janette George