This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:18 (UTC).

LYNN SIMONCINI SARMIENTO VS. GMC MORTGAGE INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 LYNN SIMONCINI SARMIENTO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GMC MORTGAGE INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8440

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARMIENTO, LYNN SIMONCINI

San Francisco, CA 94123

Defendants

GMC MORTGAGE INC.

SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RIBAR, GWEN H.

Attorney at WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK LLP

4665 Macarthur Court, Ste 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SARMIENTO, LYNN SIMONCINI AS TO DEFENDANT GMC MORTGAGE INC. SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:IFP)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO OBTAIN DISMISSAL FOLLOWING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO AMEND. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO STRIKE THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: DEMURRER TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STIKE THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES REQUEST FROM PLTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO OBTAIN DISMISSAL FOLLOWING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO AMEND. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO STRIKE THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: DEMURRER TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STIKE THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES REQUEST FROM PLTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-05-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-05-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SARMIENTO, LYNN SIMONCINI ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SARMIENTO, LYNN SIMONCINI AS TO DEFENDANT GMC MORTGAGE INC. SELECT PORFIRIO SERVICING DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less