This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:54 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK VS. SEINI KUPU et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEINI KUPU. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8428

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

Defendants

KUPU, SEINI

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRACHFELD, ERICA L

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C.

880 Apollo Street Ste 155

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS; DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATIONS RE: REDUCED FEE AND JURISDICTIONAL FACTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KUPU, SEINI DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:181.00)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • POS; DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATIONS RE: REDUCED FEE AND JURISDICTIONAL FACTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KUPU, SEINI DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:181.00)

    Read MoreRead Less