This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:38:26 (UTC).

LUIS MARTINEZ VS. SHU YI TAN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 LUIS MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHU YI TAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3058

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, LUIS

Daly City, CA 94014

Defendant

TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC

San Francisco, CA 94110

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 60.00 - SERVED MAR-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, LUIS IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,512.06 FILED BY MARTINEZ, LUIS AS TO DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-20-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, LUIS IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-10-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-10-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-10-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL.APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO: CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, BUREAU OF AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR, RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 60.00 - SERVED MAR-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO APR-10-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF MAR-20-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DECLARATION OF LUIS MARTINEZ FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, BUREAU OF AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR 10949 NORTH MATHER BLVD.,RANCHO CORDOVA, CA 95670

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,512.06 FILED BY MARTINEZ, LUIS AS TO DEFENDANT TAN, SHU YI DBA VALENCIA AUTO CLINIC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-20-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less