This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 07:25:49 (UTC).

LUCILLE D MEYER VS. 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2009 LUCILLE D MEYER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING ROOFING. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4488

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEYER, LUCILLE D

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NEWBURY, MARCUS

NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL

21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

JERRY BROWN DESIGN

ROES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

MACNAMARA, BRIAN

NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL

BROWN, JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, JOSEPH R

Attorney at L/O JOSEPH R. BROWN

13808 Ventura Blvd

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SUSSMAN, LAWRENCE ROBERT

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE R. SUSSMAN

100 Montgomery St., St3E. 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

WEBSTER, JON PAUL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JON WEBSTER

1985 Bonifacio St. Ste. 102

Concord, CA 94520

Cross Defendant Attorney

WONG, VICTORIA

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSCITY HALL, ROOM 234

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D AS TO DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-02-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-30-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-17-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED FEB-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED JAN-31-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED FEB-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS (Fee:730.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:365.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ROES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

CROSS COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ROES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-27-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT BROWN, JERRY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-27-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT JERRY BROWN DESIGN

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL BROWN, JERRY MACNAMARA, BRIAN ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, (ON AMENDED X-COMPLT 4-8-09) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, (ON AMENDED X-COMPLT 4-8-09) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-02-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR ANSWERS TO CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AUGUST 28, 2009; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-16-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, THUAN DUC FILED BY CROSS-COMPLAINT THUAN DUC TRAN ON 4/8/09 AND 4/6/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT AND MARCUS NEWBURY FILED ON MAY 12, 2009 AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ALLEGED IN THE X-COMP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-16-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-28-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-16-2009 CONTINUED TO DEC-28-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO BRING 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. CROSS COMPLAINT AT ISSUE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT(S) BRIAN MACNAMARA AND JERRY BROWN. THE NOV-16-2009 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL AS TO REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (ON AMENDED X-COMPLT 4-8-09) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-16-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. THE OCT-02-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-24-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ROES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL BROWN, JERRY JERRY BROWN DESIGN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ROES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:365.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS (Fee:730.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED FEB-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED JAN-31-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D SERVED FEB-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEYER, LUCILLE D AS TO DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY HOME IMPROVEMENT, PAINTING & ROOFING INC. NEWBURY, MARCUS FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL TRAN, THUAN DUC AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-02-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-30-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-17-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, VICTORIA