This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 22:26:00 (UTC).

LORI WILLIAMS VS. WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2012 LORI WILLIAMS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH and MARLA J. MILLER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1351

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

MARLA J. MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS, LORIP.O. BOX 574SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94083

WILLIAMS, LORI

South San Francisco, CA 94083

Defendants

CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

CARPENTERS EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING INSTITUTE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CARPENTERS TRAINING COMMITTEE FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, A JOINT LABOR-MANAGEMENT APPRENTICESHIP PROGR

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 217, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CARPENTERS TRAINING COMMITTEE FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, A JOINT LABOR-MANAGEMENT APPRENTICESHIP PROGRAM

WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICKELSON, BLYTHE

Attorney at WEINBERG, ROGER & ROSENFELD

1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200

Alameda, CA 94501

 

Court Documents

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-05-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-19-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-07-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-21-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-23-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAY-21-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CONTINIUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI SERVED JUL-05-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF: OPPOS TO MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLT BY DEFS; MEMO OF P&A ISO OPPOS TO NTC OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLT; NTC OF MTN TO APPLY SANCTIONS AND PENALTIES ON DEFS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-31-2014 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-19-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jun-02-2014 Continued To Aug-19-14 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-17-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE JUN-17-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketDISCOVERY 302, NO APPEARANCES. RULING: THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING: PLAINTIFF LORI WILLIAMS' MOTION TO APPLY SANCTIONS AND PENALTIES ON DEFENDANTS IS TRANSFERRED TO BE HEARD ON THE LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR IN ROOM 302 AT 9:30 A.M. ON THE SAME DATE. JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID MCDONALD, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-28-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-28-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2012
  • FinancialPayment : FORMS FEES - NAME CHANGE PACKETS; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : B7512A30F019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketOBTAINED BLANK FORMS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI (Fee:IFP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • FinancialPayment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : B7512A30F018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (2 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI (Fee:IFP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-07-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : W0812604F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL 217, A LABOR ORGANIZATION CARPENTERS TRAINING COMMITTEE FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, A JOINT LABOR-MANAGEMENT APPRENTICESHIP PROGRAM CARPENTERS EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING INSTITUTE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-07-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-03-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-23-2012 (Fee:IFP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

BLYTHE MICKELSON, Bar No. 095506 ROBERTA D. PERKINS, Bar No. 153074

2 || WEINBERG, ROGER & ROSENFELD A Professional Corporation 3 || 1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200 & Alameda, California 94501 4 (| Telephone (510) 337-1001 Fax (510) 337-1023 5 || E-Mail: bmickelson@unioncounsel.net rperkins@unioncounsel.net 6 Attomneys for Defendant CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN 7|| CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, a Labor Organization 8

0 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIACOUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

11{| LORI WILLIAMS, Case No. CGC 12-521351 12 Plaintiff, [PROGPSGSED] ORDER ON MOTION

TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

13 V. AND COMPLAINT 1411 WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., a California Date: January 27, 2014 Corporation; CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN Time: 9:30 AM. 15|| CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE Dept.. 302 BOARD, a Labor Organization, Judge: Hon. Marla Miller 16 Defendant.WEINBERG, ROGER &

13 V. AND COMPLAINT 1411 WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., a California Date: January 27, 2014 Corporation; CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN Time: 9:30 AM. 15|| CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE Dept.. 302 BOARD, a Labor Organization, Judge: Hon. Marla Miller 16 Defendant.WEINBERG, ROGER & California 94501

California 94501

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1351
Case Title:LORI WILLIAMS VS. WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al
Court Date:FEB-19-2014 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn To Apply Sanctions And Penalties On Defs
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Wednesday, February 19, 2014, Line 2, PLAINTIFF LORI WILLIAMS's Motion To Apply Sanctions And Penalties On Defendants.Continued to March 20, 2014 per agreement of parties. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******1351
Case Title:LORI WILLIAMS VS. WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al
Court Date:FEB-05-2014 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn To Apply Sanctions And Penalties On Defs
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, February 5, 2014, Line 1, PLAINTIFF LORI WILLIAMS Ntc Of Mtn To Apply Sanctions And Penalties On DefsPro Tem Judge Jeffrey Wohl, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem has not issued a tentative ruling on this motion. Each party is required to bring a proposed order to the hearing.


Case Number:*******1351
Case Title:LORI WILLIAMS VS. WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-27-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons And Complaint
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, January 27, 2014, Line 7, DEFENDANT CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons And ComplaintThe motion is granted. Defendant demonstrates that plaintiff failed to serve a proper summons and the operative complaint. Plaintiff's opposition is non-responsive and it is plaintiff's burden to demonstrate jurisdiction/proper service. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/eg


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD, A LABOR ORGANIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEBCOR BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICKELSON, BLYTHE