Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 00:14:10 (UTC).

LLOYD HUEY VS. JANET TANG HSIEN HENG

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 LLOYD HUEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JANET TANG HSIEN HENG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2239

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUEY, LLOYD

San Francisco, CA 94109

Respondent

HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SAWYER, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at SAWYER

230 California St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - STATUS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - STATUS ONLY, MARITAL STATUS ENDS NOV-19-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: BIFURCATE AND TERMINATE MARITAL STATUS ON NOV-19-2015 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-19-2015 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DECLARATION OF MEDIATOR CHRISTOPHER D. SAWYER FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON NOV-19-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 404 FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD AS TO RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: BIFURCATE AND TERMINATE MARITAL STATUS FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD AS TO RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN HEARING SET FOR NOV-19-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • CASE RESOLUTION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: SEP-08-2014, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: SEP-09-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, LLOYD AS TO RESPONDENT HENG, JANET TANG HSIEN SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less